EP1556866 - FLASH MEMORY CELL ARRAYS HAVING DUAL CONTROL GATES PER MEMORY CELL CHARGE STORAGE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SanDisk Corporation 140 Caspian Court Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2005/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARARI, Eliyahou 104 Auzerais Court Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03770742.9 | 09.10.2003 | [2005/30] | WO2003US32383 | Priority number, date | US20020282747 | 28.10.2002 Original published format: US 282747 | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004040583 | Date: | 13.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1556866 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1556866 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/04 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
G11C16/0483 (EP,US);
G11C16/04 (KR);
H10B41/30 (EP,US);
G11C11/34 (KR);
H01L29/40114 (EP,US);
H01L29/42348 (EP,US);
H01L29/66825 (EP,US);
H01L29/7881 (EP,US);
H10B41/35 (EP,US);
H10B69/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLASH-SPEICHERZELLENMATRIX MIT ZWEI GATE-ELEKTRODEN PRO LADUNGSSPEICHERELEMENT | [2005/30] | English: | FLASH MEMORY CELL ARRAYS HAVING DUAL CONTROL GATES PER MEMORY CELL CHARGE STORAGE ELEMENT | [2005/30] | French: | MATRICES DE CELLULES DE MEMOIRE FLASH DOTEES DE GRILLES DE COMMANDE DOUBLES PAR ELEMENT DE STOCKAGE DE CHARGE DE CELLULE DE MEMOIRE | [2005/30] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 03.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.12.2008 | BE | 24.12.2008 | CY | 24.12.2008 | CZ | 24.12.2008 | DK | 24.12.2008 | EE | 24.12.2008 | FI | 24.12.2008 | IT | 24.12.2008 | RO | 24.12.2008 | SI | 24.12.2008 | SK | 24.12.2008 | TR | 24.12.2008 | BG | 24.03.2009 | SE | 24.03.2009 | GR | 25.03.2009 | ES | 04.04.2009 | PT | 25.05.2009 | HU | 25.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IT | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
HU | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IT | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 24.12.2008 | |
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | BE | 24.12.2008 | |
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 24.12.2008 | |
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 24.12.2008 | |
SI | 24.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0637328 ; | [A]EP0373698 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1,5 * figures 8,9A-C *; | [X]US5736443 (PARK SUNG BIN [KR], et al) [X] 5,6,9,10 * abstract * * figure 2E * * column 3, line 15 - line 48 *; | [X]US6133098 (OGURA SEIKI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * figures 3A-D *; | [A]US2002102774 (KAO DAH-BIN [US], et al) [A] 1,5,9,25 * figures 6,7D *; | [PA]EP1265289 (IMEC INTER UNI MICRO ELECTR [BE]) [PA] 15,22,25 * abstract * * figure 3 *; | [PA]EP1289023 (SHARP KK [JP]) [PA] 1,5 * figure 23 *; | [X] - HAYASHI Y ET AL, "TWIN MONOS CELL WITH DUAL CONTROL GATES", 2000 SYMPOSIUM ON VLSI TECHNOLOGY. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. HONOLULU, JUNE 13-15, 2000, SYMPOSIUM ON VLSI TECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (20000613), ISBN 0-7803-6306-X, pages 122 - 123, XP000970787 [X] 1,2,5,6 * figures 1,2A-B * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940516), vol. 018, no. 255, Database accession no. (E - 1548), & JP06037328 A 19940210 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1,5 * abstract * |