EP1554488 - PRESSURE-BOOSTED FUEL INJECTION DEVICE COMPRISING AN INTERNAL CONTROL LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/29] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGEL, Hans-Christoph Bachstr. 10 72793 Pfullingen / DE | [2005/29] | Application number, filing date | 03770904.5 | 07.10.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003DE03314 | Priority number, date | DE2002147903 | 14.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10247903 | [2005/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004036027 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1554488 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1554488 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02M47/02, F02M57/02, F02M59/10, F02M63/00 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
F02M57/026 (EP,US);
F02M47/025 (EP,US);
F02M47/027 (EP,US);
F02M57/025 (EP,US);
F02M61/205 (EP,US);
F02M63/0005 (EP,US);
F02M63/0007 (EP,US);
F02M63/0015 (EP,US);
F02M63/0029 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/05] |
Former [2005/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DRUCKVERSTÄRKTE KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZEINRICHTUNG MIT INNENLIEGENDER STEUERLEITUNG | [2005/29] | English: | PRESSURE-BOOSTED FUEL INJECTION DEVICE COMPRISING AN INTERNAL CONTROL LINE | [2005/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT A PRESSION MULTIPLIEE, POURVU D'UNE CONDUITE DE COMMANDE INTERNE | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 01.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 21.10.2010 | [2011/43] | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO02092992 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [PX] 1 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO02092999 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [PX] 1 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO02092998 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [PX] 1 * page 11, line 29 - page 14, line 21 * * figures 6-9 *; | [PA]WO02092997 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [PA] 1 * page 1 - page 11 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]DE3102697 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3 - page 8 * * figure 1 *; | [DPA]DE10218904 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DPA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE19910970 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |