EP1553819 - DISPOSABLE TOILET-BOX FOR CATS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Gaudenzi, Pia Luisa Via Stoppani 14/15 22032 Albese con Cassano (CO) / IT | [2005/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/29] | Application number, filing date | 03771251.0 | 30.07.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003IT00475 | Priority number, date | IT2002VA00042 | 30.07.2002 Original published format: IT VA20020042 | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004010772 | Date: | 05.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1553819 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1553819 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/01 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
A01K1/0125 (EP,US);
A01K1/0107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEGWERFBARES KATZENKLO | [2005/29] | English: | DISPOSABLE TOILET-BOX FOR CATS | [2005/29] | French: | BOITE-TOILETTES JETABLE POUR CHATS | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 16.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 12.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.05.2005 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | 11.05.2005 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.05.2005 | M01   Fee paid on   11.05.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.03.2007 | CZ | 28.03.2007 | EE | 28.03.2007 | FI | 28.03.2007 | RO | 28.03.2007 | SE | 28.03.2007 | SI | 28.03.2007 | SK | 28.03.2007 | TR | 28.03.2007 | BG | 28.06.2007 | GR | 29.06.2007 | HU | 29.09.2007 | [2011/03] |
Former [2009/43] | CY | 28.03.2007 | |
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
TR | 28.03.2007 | ||
BG | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
HU | 29.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CY | 28.03.2007 | |
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
BG | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 28.03.2007 | |
CZ | 28.03.2007 | ||
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 28.03.2007 | |
EE | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 28.03.2007 | |
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 28.03.2007 | |
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
RO | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 28.03.2007 | |
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | FI | 28.03.2007 | |
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SK | 28.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | FI | 28.03.2007 | |
SI | 28.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | FI | 28.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4628863 (EICHENAUER LARRY L [US]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US4932360 (O'CONNOR JAMES A [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 7 * * claims 1-38 *; | [X]US4967692 (MILLS ALAN D [US]) [X] 1-12 * figures 1-7 *; | [X]US5117781 (ROACH DANIEL T [US]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9509528 (QUEEN FRANKIE A R [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 13, line 12 - line 20 * * claims 1-11 * * figures 1-12 *; | [X]US5488929 (PIERSON SUSAN K [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1-11 * * claims 1-21 *; | [X]US5572951 (EVANS RILEY [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 6 ** claims 1-5 *; | [X]US5730085 (SANTOIEMMO CARL V [US]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2754421 (GAY ANDRE [FR]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * |