EP1526191 - ELECTRODE FOR ELECTRIC DISCHARGE SURFACE TREATMENT, ELECTRIC DISCHARGE SURFACE TREATMENT METHOD AND ELECTRIC DISCHARGE SURFACE TREATMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | For all designated states IHI Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
For all designated states IHI Corporation 1-1, Toyosu 3-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8710 / JP | |||
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
For all designated states Ishikawajima-Harima Heavy Industries Co., Ltd. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8182 / JP | |||
Former [2005/17] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
For all designated states Ishikawajima-Harima Heavy Industries Co., Ltd. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8182 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTO, Akihiro Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
AKIYOSHI, Masao Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
OCHIAI, Hiroyuki 216-14, Mizuno Sayama-shi, Saitama 350-1317 / JP | 04 /
WATANABE, Mitsutoshi 1-32-12, Nogata Nakano-ku, Tokyo 165-0027 / JP | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/17] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03771434.2 | 30.07.2003 | [2005/17] | WO2003JP09687 | Priority number, date | JP20020220971 | 30.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002220971 | [2005/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004011696 | Date: | 05.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1526191 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1526191 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C23C26/00 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
C23C26/00 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/0003 (KR);
B22F3/004 (KR);
B22F7/00 (KR);
Y10T428/31678 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/17] | Title | German: | ELEKTRODE FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON OBERFLÄCHEN MIT ELEKTRISCHEN ENTLADUNGEN, VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON OBERFLÄCHEN MIT ELEKTRISCHEN ENTLADUNGEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON OBERFLÄCHEN MIT ELEKTRISCHEN ENTLADUNGEN | [2005/17] | English: | ELECTRODE FOR ELECTRIC DISCHARGE SURFACE TREATMENT, ELECTRIC DISCHARGE SURFACE TREATMENT METHOD AND ELECTRIC DISCHARGE SURFACE TREATMENT APPARATUS | [2005/17] | French: | ELECTRODE DESTINEE A UN TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE PAR DECHARGE ELECTRIQUE, PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE PAR DECHARGE ELECTRIQUE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE PAR DECHARGE ELECTRIQUE | [2005/17] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2004 | Translation filed | 05.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 02.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.07.2010 | BE | 21.07.2010 | CY | 21.07.2010 | CZ | 21.07.2010 | DK | 21.07.2010 | EE | 21.07.2010 | FI | 21.07.2010 | NL | 21.07.2010 | SI | 21.07.2010 | SK | 21.07.2010 | TR | 21.07.2010 | IE | 30.07.2010 | LU | 30.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | BG | 21.10.2010 | GR | 22.10.2010 | PT | 22.11.2010 | HU | 22.01.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
IE | 30.07.2010 | ||
LU | 30.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
HU | 22.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
IE | 30.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
HU | 22.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
IE | 30.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
EE | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
SK | 21.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
DK | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
BE | 21.07.2010 | ||
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
GR | 22.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
CY | 21.07.2010 | ||
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
BG | 21.10.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
FI | 21.07.2010 | ||
NL | 21.07.2010 | ||
SI | 21.07.2010 | ||
PT | 22.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 21.07.2010 | |
NL | 21.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0770761 (JAPAN RES DEV CORP) [X] 1,3,5,10-12,15,18,23,25,27 * page 3, paragraph 15 * * paragraph [0024] * * page 4, paragraph 35 * * abstract *; | [A]WO9958744 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-31 * page 7, paragraph 52 - page 8, line 4 *; | [A]EP1035231 (ISHIZUKA RESEARCH INST LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-31 * page 4, paragraph 31 * * abstract *; | [X]JP2001138141 (SAWAGUCHI KAZUO, et al) [X] 1-31 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 15 * * page 4, paragraph 19 * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0024] * * page 5, paragraph 28 *; | CH695188 [ ] (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH0770761 (JAPAN RES DEV CORP) | by applicant | JPH0770761 | JP2001138141 |