EP1527629 - HANDOVER BETWEEN A CELLULAR SYSTEM AND A WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza Suite 105 Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza Suite 105 Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | ||
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION Suite 527, 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REDDY, Gautam, G. 18 Walnut Parkway, No. 1 Montclaire, NJ 07042 / US | [2006/50] |
Former [2005/18] | 01 /
REDDY, Gautam, G. 540 Steven Drive, Apt. 207 King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | Representative(s) | Giver, Sören Bo, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | Giver, Sören Bo, et al Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 03771625.5 | 14.07.2003 | [2005/18] | WO2003US22103 | Priority number, date | US20020399814P | 31.07.2002 Original published format: US 399814 P | [2005/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004012468 | Date: | 05.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1527629 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1527629 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
H04W36/322 (EP,KR);
H04W36/0066 (KR);
H04W36/32 (US);
H04W36/142 (EP,KR);
H04W84/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/18] | H04Q7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEITERREICHEN ZWISCHEN EINEM ZELLULAREN SYSTEM UND EINEM DRATHLOSEN LOKALEN NETZ | [2007/35] | English: | HANDOVER BETWEEN A CELLULAR SYSTEM AND A WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORK | [2005/18] | French: | TRANSFERT ENTRE UN SYSTEME CELLULAIRE ET UN RESEAU LOCAL SANS FIL | [2005/18] |
Former [2005/18] | WEITERREICHEN ZWISCHEN ZELLULAR SYSTEM UND SCHNURLOSSES LOKALES NETZ | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 29.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.04.2008 | BE | 09.04.2008 | CY | 09.04.2008 | CZ | 09.04.2008 | DK | 09.04.2008 | EE | 09.04.2008 | NL | 09.04.2008 | RO | 09.04.2008 | SI | 09.04.2008 | SK | 09.04.2008 | TR | 09.04.2008 | BG | 09.07.2008 | GR | 10.07.2008 | IE | 14.07.2008 | LU | 14.07.2008 | CH | 31.07.2008 | LI | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | PT | 09.09.2008 | HU | 10.10.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
TR | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 14.07.2008 | ||
LU | 14.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
HU | 10.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 14.07.2008 | ||
LU | 14.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
HU | 10.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 14.07.2008 | ||
LU | 14.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 14.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IE | 14.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 09.04.2008 | |
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 09.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001055976 (CROUCH SIMON EDWIN [GB], et al) [A] 1-36 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0070] ** figures 1,2 *; | [X] - YLIANTTILA M ET AL, "GEOLOCATION INFORMATION AND INTER-TECHNOLOGY HANDOFF", ICC 2000. 2000 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS. CONFERENCE RECORD. NEW ORLEANS, LA, JUNE 18-22, 2000, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20000618), VOL 3 OF 3, ISBN 0-7803-6284-5, pages 1573 - 1577, XP001208676 [X] 1-36 * page 1573, column L, line 20 - line 38 * * page 1573, column R, line 16 - page 1574, column L, line 46 * * page 1576, column L, line 36 - line 56 * * page 1577, column R, line 1 - line 23 * | International search | [Y]US5826188 (TAYLOE DANIEL RICHARD [US], et al); | [Y]US5918176 (ARRINGTON JR ARTHUR EDWARD [US], et al); | [AT]US2003118015 (GUNNARSSON MAGNUS [US], et al); | [AP]US2003156566 (GRISWOLD DOUG [US], et al); | [AT]US2003202497 (CSAPO JOHN S [US]) |