EP1540282 - LINEAR POSITION SENSING EMPLOYING TWO GEARTOOTH SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOLFUS, Joel, D. 2486 Royal Oaks Drive Freeport, IL 61032 / US | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03771883.0 | 23.07.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US23396 | Priority number, date | US20020208411 | 29.07.2002 Original published format: US 208411 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004011884 | Date: | 05.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1540282 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/04, G01D5/247 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
G01D5/04 (EP,US);
G01D5/247 (EP,US);
Y10T74/1926 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/46] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LINEARPOSITIONSMESSUNG MIT ZWEI ZAHNRADSENSOREN | [2005/24] | English: | LINEAR POSITION SENSING EMPLOYING TWO GEARTOOTH SENSORS | [2005/24] | French: | DETECTION DE POSITIONS LINEAIRES AU MOYEN DE DEUX DETECTEURS A DENTS, D'UN ENGRENAGE HELICOIDAL ET D'UN ENGRENAGE DROIT | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 20.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/04] | 05.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0287214 (SCHLUMBERGER ELECTRONICS UK [GB]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document * |