EP1585559 - OPTICAL MRI CATHETER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biophan Technologies, Inc. 150 Lucius Gordon Drive West Henrietta, NY 14586 / US | [2005/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELFER, Jeffrey, L. 1153 Hidden Valley Trail Webster, NY 14580 / US | 02 /
MACDONALD, Stuart, G. 4663 East Lake Road Pultneyville, NY 14538 / US | 03 /
GRAY, Robert, W. 180 Poplar Street, 4 Rochester, NY 14620 / US | 04 /
THOMAS, Christopher 53 Collamer Street Rochester, NY 14617 / US | [2005/49] |
Former [2005/42] | 01 /
HELFER, Jeffrey, L. 1153 Hidden Valley Trail Webster, NY 14580 / US | ||
02 /
MACDONALD, Stuart, G. 4663 East Lake Road Pultneyville, NY 14538 / US | |||
03 /
GRAY, Robert, W. 180 Poplar Street, 4 Rochester, NY 14620 / US | |||
04 /
CHRISTOPHER, Thomas 53 Collamer Street Rochester, NY 14617 / US | Representative(s) | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London, WC1V 7QH / GB | ||
Former [2005/42] | Jehan, Robert, et al Williams, Powell, Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct London EC1A 2BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03771896.2 | 25.07.2003 | [2005/42] | WO2003US23416 | Priority number, date | US20020202921 | 25.07.2002 Original published format: US 202921 | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004011059 | Date: | 05.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1585559 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/05, G01R33/28 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
A61B5/055 (EP,US);
G01R33/285 (EP,US);
G01R33/34084 (EP,US);
G01R33/3692 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/28] | A61B5/05 | ||
Former IPC [2005/42] | A61M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES MRT-KATHETERSYSTEM | [2005/42] | English: | OPTICAL MRI CATHETER SYSTEM | [2005/42] | French: | SYSTEME DE CATHETER OPTIQUE POUR IRM | [2005/42] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 08.05.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5545999 (MUELLER OTWARD M [US], et al) [A] 1,22* column 5, line 22 - line 31; figures 2,3 *; | [X]DE19640463 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,10-14,18-20 * column 1, line 34 - line 46 * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 26 *; | [XY]US5882305 (DUMOULIN CHARLES LUCIAN [US], et al) [X] 1-23,25-42 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 52 * [Y] 3,24; | [Y]US2001029331 (GINGGEN ALEC [CH], et al) [Y] 3,24 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * | International search | [A]US5882305 (DUMOULIN CHARLES LUCIAN [US], et al); | [A]US6535755 (EHNHOLM GOSTA J [FI]); | [A]US6493573 (MARTINELLI MICHAEL A [US], et al) |