EP1549210 - Integrated confirmation sample in a body fluid test device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/27] | INTEGRATED CONFIRMATION SAMPLE IN A BODY FLUID TEST DEVICE | ||
[2012/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Branan Medical Corp. 140 Technology Dr., Suite 400 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2013/26] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Branan Medical Corp. Suite E & F, 10015 Muirlands Road Irvine, CA 92618 / US | ||
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states Branan Medical Corp. Suite E & F, 10015 Muirlands Road Irvine, CA 92618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, Raphael, C. 5221 Hiram Lane Irvine, CA 92612 / US | 02 /
WANG, Dequn 12631 El Camino Real 2203 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/27] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03771928.3 | 29.07.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003US23459 | Priority number, date | US20020208574 | 29.07.2002 Original published format: US 208574 | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004010940 | Date: | 05.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1549210 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1549210 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, B65D81/00, G01N33/558, // A61B10/00 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
G01N33/558 (EP,US);
A61B5/145 (EP,US);
A61B10/0051 (EP,US);
A61B5/14539 (EP,US);
A61B5/14546 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/27] | A61B5/00, B65D81/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Title | German: | Integrierte Bestätigungsprobe in einer Körperflussigkeits-Testvorrichtung | [2012/10] | English: | Integrated confirmation sample in a body fluid test device | [2012/10] | French: | Dispositif d'analyse de fluide biologique avec échantillon de confirmation intégré | [2012/10] |
Former [2005/27] | INTEGRIERTE BESTÄTIGUNGSPROBE IN EINER KÖRPERFLÜSSIGKEITS-TESTVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2005/27] | INTEGRATED CONFIRMATION SAMPLE IN A BODY FLUID TEST DEVICE | ||
Former [2005/27] | ECHANTILLON DE CONFIRMATION INTEGRE, DANS UN DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE DE FLUIDE BIOLOGIQUE ET SON PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 02.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2003 | AT | 27.02.2013 | BE | 27.02.2013 | CY | 27.02.2013 | CZ | 27.02.2013 | DK | 27.02.2013 | EE | 27.02.2013 | FI | 27.02.2013 | MC | 27.02.2013 | NL | 27.02.2013 | RO | 27.02.2013 | SE | 27.02.2013 | SI | 27.02.2013 | SK | 27.02.2013 | TR | 27.02.2013 | BG | 27.05.2013 | GR | 28.05.2013 | PT | 27.06.2013 | IE | 29.07.2013 | LU | 29.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
TR | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
IE | 29.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
IE | 29.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
MC | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CY | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
RO | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SK | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
DK | 27.02.2013 | ||
EE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
NL | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
PT | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
BE | 27.02.2013 | ||
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
FI | 27.02.2013 | ||
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
SI | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
GR | 28.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 27.02.2013 | |
SE | 27.02.2013 | ||
BG | 27.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 27.02.2013 | |
BG | 27.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9311434 (OSBORN LAB INC [US]) [Y] 2,3,11-26 * abstract * * page 35, line 28 - page 36, line 21; figures 12-16 *; | [A]WO0131337 (GENOSIS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 6-11,15,18,30-32* the whole document *; | [XY]US6372516 (SUN MING [US]) [X] 1,4-10,27-32 * column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 28; figures 1-7 * [Y] 2,3,11-26 | International search | [X]US6372516 (SUN MING [US]); | [A]US6365417 (FLEMING WILLIAM H [US], et al); | [A]US6303081 (MINK RONALD W [US], et al); | [A]US6248598 (BOGEMA STUART C [US]) | by applicant | US6365417 | US6248598 |