EP1527001 - CONTINUOUS STRIP BAG FEEDER AND LOADER WITH PIVOTABLE INTEGRATED PRINTER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Packaging Systems LLC W227 N62076 Sussex Road Sussex, WI 53089 / US | [2006/28] |
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states Sharp Packaging Systems, Inc. W227 N62076 Sussex Road Sussex, WI 53089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAHIER, Timothy, E. W1936 Staude Road Rome, WI 53178 / US | 02 /
GLEESING, James, W. 228 South Dann Street Whitewater, WI 53190 / US | [2005/18] | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [2005/18] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk, Patent Attorneys, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 03772057.0 | 29.07.2003 | [2005/18] | WO2003US23732 | Priority number, date | US20020208981 | 31.07.2002 Original published format: US 208981 | [2005/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004011332 | Date: | 05.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1527001 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1527001 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65B43/12 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
B65B43/267 (EP,US);
B65B43/123 (EP,US);
B65B61/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/18] | Title | German: | ZUFÜHR- UND LADEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN KONTINUIERLICHES BEUTELBAND MIT INTERGRIERTER VERSCHWENKBARER DRUCKANORDNUNG | [2005/18] | English: | CONTINUOUS STRIP BAG FEEDER AND LOADER WITH PIVOTABLE INTEGRATED PRINTER ASSEMBLY | [2005/18] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR ET CHARGEUR DE SACS EN BANDE CONTINUE AVEC ENSEMBLE IMPRIMANTE INTEGRE PIVOTABLE | [2005/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 14.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2003 | AT | 14.12.2011 | BE | 14.12.2011 | CY | 14.12.2011 | CZ | 14.12.2011 | DK | 14.12.2011 | EE | 14.12.2011 | FI | 14.12.2011 | IT | 14.12.2011 | NL | 14.12.2011 | RO | 14.12.2011 | SE | 14.12.2011 | SI | 14.12.2011 | SK | 14.12.2011 | TR | 14.12.2011 | BG | 14.03.2012 | GR | 15.03.2012 | ES | 25.03.2012 | PT | 16.04.2012 | IE | 29.07.2012 | LU | 29.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
IE | 29.07.2012 | ||
LU | 29.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
IE | 29.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
IE | 29.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 14.12.2011 | |
BE | 14.12.2011 | ||
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 14.12.2011 | |
CY | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 14.12.2011 | |
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2142282 (TOKYO AUTOMATIC MACH WORKS) [A] 1,4,7 * page 3, line 20 - line 50; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US4899520 (LERNER BERNARD [US], et al) [A] 8,9* column 8, line 6 - column 9, line 66; figures 3-11 *; | [X]EP0564288 (AUTOMATED PACKAGING SYST INC [US]) [X] 1-11,16 * column 3, line 48 - column 7, line 26; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2002062920 (BRAHIER TIMOTHY E [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4-6,8 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0049]; figures 2-5 * |