EP1534313 - OPHTHALMOLOGIC IRRIGATION SOLUTIONS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omeros Corporation 201 Elliott Avenue West Seattle, WA 98119 / US | [2013/04] |
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states Omeros Corporation 1420 Fifth Avenue Suite 2600 Seattle, WA 98101 / US | ||
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Omeros Corporation 1420 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2600 Seattle, WA 98101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMOPULOS, Gregory, A. 6530 83rd Place S.E. Mercer Island, WA 98040 / US | 02 /
PALMER, Pamela, Pierce 140 Vasquez Avenue San Francisco, CA 94127 / US | 03 /
HERZ, Jeffrey, M. 14427 12th Drive S.E. Mill Creek, WA 98012 / US | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al avidity IP Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/22] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03772122.2 | 30.07.2003 | [2005/22] | WO2003US23871 | Priority number, date | US20020399899P | 30.07.2002 Original published format: US 399899 P | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004010894 | Date: | 05.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1534313 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1534313 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61K45/06, A61K9/00, A61K38/00 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K31/4164 (EP,US);
A61K31/4174 (EP,US);
A61K31/4409 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (US);
A61P23/00 (EP);
A61P23/02 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/04 (EP);
A61P27/08 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P29/02 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2005/22] | A61K38/00, A61K31/56, A61K31/19 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] | Title | German: | OPHTHALMOLOGISCHE IRRIGATIONSLÖSUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2012/32] | English: | OPHTHALMOLOGIC IRRIGATION SOLUTIONS AND METHOD | [2005/22] | French: | SOLUTIONS ET PROCEDE D'IRRIGATION OPHTALMOLOGIQUE | [2005/22] |
Former [2005/22] | OPHTHALMOLOSCHE IRRIGATIONSL SUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 09.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12180714.3 Application withdrawn : 12.12.2012 | EP12180716.8 Application withdrawn : 12.12.2012 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002161032 ; | [X]WO0224191 ; | [X]EP0550921 (ZAMBON SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,4,6-17 * claim 3 *; | [X]WO9838996 (DARWIN DISCOVERY LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3,4,6-17* page 2, line 16 - line 18 *; | [X]EP0903151 (ASTA MEDICA AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6-17 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0001379 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-17 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0003705 (ALCON LAB INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-17 * page 5, paragraph 2; claims 1,13; table 1 *; | [X]US6218428 (CHYNN EMIL [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6-17 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0141550 (COMPOUNDINGPHARMACIES COM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-17 * page 8, line 5; claims 1,3 *; | [X] - CHERRY P M, "THE TREATMENT OF PAIN FOLLOWING EXCIMER LASER PHOTOREFRACTIVE KERATECTOMY: ADDITIVE EFFECT OF LOCAL ANESTHETIC DROPS, TOPICAL DICLOFENAC, AND BANDAGE SOFT CONTACT", OPHTHALMIC SURGERY AND LASERS, SLACK, INC., THOROFARE, NJ, US, (199605), vol. 27, no. 5, ISSN 1082-3069, pages S477 - S480, XP009079352 [X] 1-3,6-17 * the whole document * | [X] - VOLPE NICOLA ET AL, Single dose ondansetron for prevention of postoperative nausea and vomiting: Results from the Italian Multicentre Ondansetron study, DRUG INVESTIGATION, VOL. 8, NR. 2, PAGE(S) 67-72, (1994), ISSN 0114-2402, XP009079353 [X] 1-3,6-17 * page 67 * | [X] - ARSHINOFF S A ET AL, "PHARMACOTHERAPY OF PHOTOREFRACTIVE KERATECTOMY", JOURNAL CATARACT AND REFRACTIVE SURGERY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CATARACT AND REFRACTIVE, US, (1996), vol. 22, no. 8, ISSN 0886-3350, pages 1037 - 1044, XP009078946 [X] 1-3,6-17 * table 2 * | [X] - GROND STEFAN ET AL, Inhibition of synovial plasma extravasation by preemptive administration of an antiinflammatory irrigation solution in the rat knee, ANESTHESIA AND ANALGESIA, VOL. 92, NR. 5, PAGE(S) 1301-1306, (200105), ISSN 0003-2999, XP009078924 [X] 1-3,6-17 * page 1303, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00000539-200105000-00042 | [X] - CHAUDHARY K P ET AL, Preoperative topical flurbiprofen sodium in extracapsular lens extraction role in maintaining intraoperative pupillary dilatation, INDIAN JOURNAL OF OPHTHALMOLOGY, VOL. 40, NR. 4, PAGE(S) 109-114, (1992), ISSN 0301-4738, XP009078981 [X] 1,2,4,6-17 * page 110, column R - page 111, column L * | [X] - GOYAL RAINA ET AL, "Randomised controlled trial of ketorolac in the management of corneal abrasions", ACTA OPHTHALMOLOGICA SCANDINAVICA, HVIDOVRE, DK, (200104), vol. 79, no. 2, ISSN 1395-3907, pages 177 - 179, XP009099256 [X] 1,2,4,6-17 * the whole document * | [X] - ARSHINOFF S ET AL, "USE OF TOPICAL NONSTEROIDAL ANTI-INFLAMMATORY DRUGS IN EXCIMER LASER PHOTOREFRACTIVE KERATECTOMY", JOURNAL CATARACT AND REFRACTIVE SURGERY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CATARACT AND REFRACTIVE, US, (199403), vol. 20, no. SUPPL, ISSN 0886-3350, pages 216 - 222, XP002068878 [X] 1,2,4,6-17 * table 2 * | [X] - GIMBEL H V, The effect of treatment with topical nonsteroidal anti-inflammatory drugs with and without intraoperative epinephrine on the maintenance of mydriasis during cataract surgery, OPHTHALMOLOGY 1989 US, VOL. 96, NR. 5, PAGE(S) 585 - 588, (1989), ISSN 0161-6420, XP009099268 [X] 1,2,4,6-17 * the whole document * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 56, Database accession no. 2002-523513, XP002477850 & JP2002161032 A 20020604 (TAISHO PHARM CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,6-17 * abstract * | [X] - BUSSE W ET AL, "A multicenter, double-blind, randomized, placebo-controlled trial comparing the efficacy and tolerability of levocabastine-oxymetazoline nasal spray with levocabastine and oxymetazoline alone in the symptomatic treatment of seasonal allergic rhinitis", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF RHINOLOGY, OCEANSIDE PUBLICATIONS, PROVIDENCE, RI, US, (1996), vol. 10, no. 2, ISSN 1050-6586, pages 105 - 111, XP009099302 [X] 1,2,4,6-17 * the whole document * | [X] - QUIROZ C ET AL, "N. F. 12: A new topical solution for external eye diseases", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF OPHTHALMOLOGY 1956, (1956), vol. 41, no. 6, ISSN 0002-9394, pages 1020 - 1024, XP009099546 [X] 1,2,4,6-17 * the whole document * | [X] - GRAHN B ET AL, "Diagnostic ophthalmology", CANADIAN VETERINARY JOURNAL 1994 CA, (1994), vol. 35, no. 11, ISSN 0008-5286, pages 730 - 731, XP009099513 [X] 1,2,4,6-17 * page 730, column R * | [X] - ANGRA S K ET AL, "SAFE AND EFFECTIVE MANAGEMENT OF VERNAL KERATOCONJUNCTIVITIS VKC A DOUBLE BLIND CLINICAL STUDY", ANNALS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES (INDIA), (1989), vol. 25, no. 1, ISSN 0379-038X, pages 9 - 12, XP009099597 [X] 1,2,4,6-17 * page 12; tables 1,2 * | [X] - BATRA D ET AL, "Patterns of responses to alternative medicines in controlling allergic conjunctivitis", INDIAN JOURNAL OF OPHTHALMOLOGY 1988 IN, (1988), vol. 36, no. 1, pages 17 - 21, XP009099588 [X] 1,2,4,6-17 * the whole document * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 39, Database accession no. 2002-362397, XP002478749 & WO0224191 A 20020328 (YONG GUANG PHARM CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,6-17 * abstract * | International search | [Y]WO9408602 (ALCON LAB INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO9516435 (ALCON LAB INC [US]); | [A]US5523316 (GAN OWEN [US], et al); | [A]US5624893 (YANNI JOHN M [US]) | by applicant | US4550022 | - GIMBEL, OPHTHALMOLOGY, (1989), vol. 96, pages 585 - 588 | - GUO, X. ET AL., "Comparative inhibition of voltage-gated cation channels by local anesthetics", ANN. NY. ACAD. SCI., (1991), vol. 625, pages 181 - 199 | - GENTILI, M ET AL., PAIN, (1996), vol. 64, pages 593 - 596 | - MUNK, S. ET AL., J MED. CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, pages 3533 - 3538 | - FUDER H., J. OCUL. PHARMACOL, (1994), vol. 10, pages 109 - 123 | - CHU T. ET AL., PHARMACOLOGY, (1996), vol. 53, pages 259 - 270 | - BISLA K ET AL., INVEST. OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., (1992), vol. 33, pages 3029 - 3033 | - DADEYA S. ET AL., J. X PEDIAIR. OPHTHALMOL STRABISMUS., (2002), vol. 39, pages 1766 - 168 |