EP1552198 - CONTROLLABLE SOLENOID VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2014 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): ES | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rausch & Pausch GmbH Albert-Pausch-Ring 1 95100 Selb / DE | [2006/13] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Rausch & Pausch GmbH Albert-Pausch-Ring 1 95100 Selb / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DÖHLA, Werner Reuthweg 5 95482 Gefrees / DE | 02 /
RAUCH, Michael Grosswendern 120 95168 Marktleuthen / DE | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Bock, Gerhard Patentanwälte Bock & Bieber GbR Hans-Knöll-Strasse 1 07745 Jena / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Bock, Gerhard Patentanwälte Bock & Bieber GbR Hans-Knöll-Strasse 1 07745 Jena / DE | ||
Former [2005/28] | Bock, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Bock & Bieber GbR, Albert-Einstein-Strasse 6 07745 Jena / DE | Application number, filing date | 03773543.8 | 15.10.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003DE03449 | Priority number, date | DE2002148501 | 15.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10248501 | [2005/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004036057 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1552198 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1552198 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/06, F15B13/04, F15B13/044 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
F16K31/0637 (EP,US);
F15B13/01 (EP,US);
F15B13/0402 (EP,US);
F15B13/0405 (EP,US);
F15B13/0442 (EP,US);
F16K31/062 (EP);
F15B2211/20538 (EP);
F15B2211/50536 (EP);
F15B2211/7052 (EP);
Y10T137/87241 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Title | German: | STEUERBARES MAGNETVENTIL | [2005/28] | English: | CONTROLLABLE SOLENOID VALVE | [2005/28] | French: | ELECTROVANNE REGLABLE | [2006/13] |
Former [2005/28] | ELECTROVANNE REGULABLE | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 14.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 28.03.2006 | Stay of proceedings | [2006/20] | 28.03.2006 | Stay of proceedings | [2008/15] | 01.04.2008 | Resumption of proceedings | [2008/15] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.11.2008 | CZ | 05.11.2008 | DK | 05.11.2008 | EE | 05.11.2008 | ES | 05.11.2008 | FI | 05.11.2008 | GR | 05.11.2008 | IE | 05.11.2008 | IT | 05.11.2008 | RO | 05.11.2008 | SE | 05.11.2008 | SI | 05.11.2008 | SK | 05.11.2008 | TR | 05.11.2008 | PT | 05.04.2009 | HU | 06.05.2009 | [2014/50] |
Former [2014/38] | CY | 05.11.2008 | |
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
GR | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
IT | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SE | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
TR | 05.11.2008 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
PT | 05.04.2009 | ||
HU | 06.05.2009 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 05.11.2008 | |
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
IT | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SE | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
TR | 05.11.2008 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
PT | 05.04.2009 | ||
HU | 06.05.2009 | ||
Former [2013/32] | CY | 05.11.2008 | |
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SE | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
TR | 05.11.2008 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
PT | 05.04.2009 | ||
HU | 06.05.2009 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 05.11.2008 | |
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
TR | 05.11.2008 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
PT | 05.04.2009 | ||
HU | 06.05.2009 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 05.11.2008 | |
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
TR | 05.11.2008 | ||
ES | 16.02.2009 | ||
HU | 06.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/43] | CY | 05.11.2008 | |
CZ | 05.11.2008 | ||
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
TR | 05.11.2008 | ||
HU | 06.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 05.11.2008 | |
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
SK | 05.11.2008 | ||
HU | 06.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 05.11.2008 | |
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
IE | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CZ | 05.11.2008 | |
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
FI | 05.11.2008 | ||
RO | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CZ | 05.11.2008 | |
DK | 05.11.2008 | ||
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/36] | DK | 05.11.2008 | |
EE | 05.11.2008 | ||
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | DK | 05.11.2008 | |
SI | 05.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | SI | 05.11.2008 | Cited in | International search | [YD]DE3722344 (RAUSCH & PAUSCH [DE]) [YD] 5,6,8* column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 12; figure 1 *; | [XY]US6412884 (TAKAYAMA TOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 5, line 63 - column 8, line 43; figures 1-5 * [Y] 5,6,8 | by applicant | DE3722344 | EP0565190 |