EP1556500 - SIMPLE ENZYMATIC PROCESS FOR PREPARING CEFAZOLIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioferma Murcia, S.A. Poligono Industrial "Las Salinas", Avda. Europa s/n 30840 Alhama de Murcia Murcia / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Bioferma Murcia, S.A. Poligono Industrial "Las Salinas", Avda. Europa s/n 30840 Alhama de Murcia, Murcia / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARCIA CARMONA, Francisco Islas Medas, 17 E-30500 La Alcaina-Molina De Segura / ES | 02 /
SANCHEZ FERRER, Alvaro Veronicas, 15 E-30820 Alcantarilla (Murcia) / ES | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2005/30] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co., C/ Goya No. 11 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 03773688.1 | 30.10.2003 | [2005/30] | WO2003EP12165 | Priority number, date | EP20020380224 | 31.10.2002 Original published format: EP 02380224 | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004039997 | Date: | 13.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1556500 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12P35/04, C12N9/84, C07D501/36 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
C12Y305/01011 (EP);
C12P35/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINFACHES ENZYMATISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CEFALOZOLIN | [2005/30] | English: | SIMPLE ENZYMATIC PROCESS FOR PREPARING CEFAZOLIN | [2005/30] | French: | PROCEDE ENZYMATIQUE SIMPLE DE PREPARATION DE CEFAZOLINE | [2005/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 31.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/40] | 15.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5677141 (ISOGAI TAKAO [JP], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US6465227 (REICHERT ARNO [AT], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [PXD]WO02086143 (BIOFERMA MURCIA S A [ES], et al) [PXD] 1-39* the whole document *; | [AD] - FERNANDEZ-LAFUENTE R ET AL, "Chemoenzymatic One-pot Synthesis of Cefazolin from Cephalosporin C in Fully Aqueous Medium, Involving Three Consecutive Biotransformations Catalyzed by D-Aminoacid Oxidase, Glutaryl Acylase and Penicillin G Acylase", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970630), vol. 38, no. 26, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 4693 - 4696, XP004074870 [AD] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(97)00999-4 | [AD] - WON J I ET AL, "THE EFFECT OF 2-MERCAPTO-5-METHYL-1,3,4-THIADIAZOLE ON ENZYMATIC SYNTHESIS OF CEFAZOLIN", APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, CLIFTON, NJ, US, (199801), vol. 69, no. 1, ISSN 0273-2289, pages 1 - 9, XP001105929 [AD] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02786016 | [A] - PARK C B ET AL, "PENICILLIN ACYLASE-CATALYZED SYNTHESIS OF CEFAZOLIN IN WATER-SOLVENT MIXTURES: ENHANCEMENT EFFECT OF ETHYL ACETATE AND CARBON TETRACHLORIDE ON THE SYNTHETIC YIELD", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS. B, ENZYMATIC, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM,, NL, (20000421), vol. 9, no. 4-6, ISSN 1381-1177, pages 275 - 281, XP000989461 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1381-1177(99)00106-X | [AD] - JUSTIZ O H ET AL, "One-pot chemoenzymatic synthesis of 3'-funcionalized cephalosporines (cefazolin) by three consecutive biotransformations in ully aqueous medium", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (1997), vol. 62, no. 26, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 9099 - 9106, XP002177920 [AD] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo971166u |