EP1565704 - LEVEL, ANGLE AND DISTANCE MEASURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rock, Alan George 1 Shelley Close, Bicester Oxfordshire OX26 2YZ / GB | For all designated states Rock, Angus James 14 Scholar Place, Off Arnold Way, Cumnor Hill Oxford Oxfordshire OX2 9RD / GB | [2008/44] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states Rock, Alan George 1 Shelley Close, Bicester Oxfordshire OX26 2YZ / GB | ||
For all designated states Rock, Angus James 14 Scholar Place, Off Arnold Way, Cumnor Hill Oxford Oxfordshire OX2 9RD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/34] | Representative(s) | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03773860.6 | 14.11.2003 | [2005/34] | WO2003GB04945 | Priority number, date | GB20020026764 | 15.11.2002 Original published format: GB 0226764 | GB20030004651 | 28.02.2003 Original published format: GB 0304651 | [2005/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004046651 | Date: | 03.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1565704 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1565704 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/16, G01F3/00, G01P1/00 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
G01C1/00 (EP,GB,US);
G01C21/16 (GB);
G01C3/00 (GB);
G01P1/07 (GB);
G06F3/033 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PEGEL, WINKEL UND ABSTANDSMESSEINRICHTUNG | [2005/34] | English: | LEVEL, ANGLE AND DISTANCE MEASURING DEVICE | [2005/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE NIVEAU, D'ANGLE ET DE DISTANCE | [2005/34] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 19.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.10.2008 | BE | 29.10.2008 | CY | 29.10.2008 | CZ | 29.10.2008 | DK | 29.10.2008 | EE | 29.10.2008 | FI | 29.10.2008 | IT | 29.10.2008 | NL | 29.10.2008 | RO | 29.10.2008 | SI | 29.10.2008 | SK | 29.10.2008 | TR | 29.10.2008 | IE | 14.11.2008 | LU | 14.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | BG | 29.01.2009 | SE | 29.01.2009 | GR | 30.01.2009 | ES | 09.02.2009 | PT | 30.03.2009 | HU | 30.04.2009 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CY | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
TR | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 14.11.2008 | ||
LU | 14.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
HU | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CY | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 14.11.2008 | ||
LU | 14.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
HU | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 14.11.2008 | ||
LU | 14.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 14.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
IE | 14.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
SK | 29.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
EE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
RO | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SI | 29.10.2008 | ||
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BG | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 09.02.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1089215 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]US6292751 (FRANK MARK [US]); | [Y]WO0188477 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]); | [A]WO02059869 (IMMERSION CORP [US]) | by applicant | EP1089215 | US6292751 | WO0188477 |