EP1478053 - PRESS-CONTACT CONNECTOR BUILT IN SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 4-8 Minamisenba 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-0081 / JP | [2012/33] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 4-8 Minamisenba 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOTO, Akira, c/o J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1099-25, Aza-Marune Oaza-Kurozasa Miyoshi-cho Nishikamo-gun, Aichi 470-0201 / JP | 02 /
TAKAGI, Yoshikazu, c/o J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1099-25, Aza-Marune Oaza-Kurozasa Miyoshi-cho Nishikamo-gun, Aichi 470-0201 / JP | 03 /
MIYAHARA, Kazushi, c/o J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1099-25, Aza-Marune Oaza-Kurozasa Miyoshi-cho Nishikamo-gun, Aichi 470-0201 / JP | 04 /
CHIYODA, Megumi, c/o J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1099-25, Aza-Marune Oaza-Kurozasa Miyoshi-cho Nishikamo-gun, Aichi 470-0201 / JP | [2012/33] |
Former [2004/47] | 01 /
GOTO, Akira, c/o J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1099-25, Aza-Marune, Oaza-Kurozasa, Miyoshi-cho Nishikamo-gun, Aichi 470-0201 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAGI, Yoshikazu, c/o J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1099-25, Aza-Marune, Oaza-Kurozasa, Miyoshi-cho Nishikamo-gun, Aichi 470-0201 / JP | |||
03 /
MIYAHARA, Kazushi, c/o J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1099-25, Aza-Marune, Oaza-Kurozasa, Miyoshi-cho Nishikamo-gun, Aichi 470-0201 / JP | |||
04 /
CHIYODA, Megumi, c/o J.S.T. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1099-25, Aza-Marune, Oaza-Kurozasa, Miyoshi-cho Nishikamo-gun, Aichi 470-0201 / JP | Representative(s) | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2004/47] | Price, Paul Anthony King, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03774138.6 | 21.11.2003 | [2004/47] | WO2003JP14898 | Priority number, date | JP20020339688 | 22.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002339688 | JP20020339689 | 22.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002339689 | [2004/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004049512 | Date: | 10.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1478053 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1478053 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/03, H01R4/24 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
H01R4/2433 (EP,US);
H01R4/24 (KR);
H01R12/515 (EP,US);
H01R4/2454 (EP,US);
H01R9/03 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/11] |
Former [2004/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DRUCKKONTAKTVERBINDER-EINBAUSUBSTRAT | [2004/47] | English: | PRESS-CONTACT CONNECTOR BUILT IN SUBSTRATE | [2004/47] | French: | CONNECTEUR A CONTACT PAR PRESSION INTEGRE DANS UN SUBSTRAT | [2004/47] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2004 | Translation filed | 05.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 14.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 15.08.2012 | [2013/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4381132 (TOURNIER GILLES F A [FR]) [A] 1,5,7* column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 4; figures 2,3,6,7 *; | [A]US5735706 (ITO OSAMU [JP]) [A] 1,5,7 * column 4, line 35 - line 61; figures 4-11 * | International search | [A]JPS5184084 (AMP); | [A]JPH09261821 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS); | [A]JPH11354191 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS); | [A]JPH0244457Y ; | [A]JPS60211784 (BABCOCK & WILCOX CO); | [A]JP2001327038 (YAZAKI CORP) | Examination | US3963319 | US6024583 | by applicant | US6024583 |