EP1562757 - A SECURITY PAPER, A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SECURITY PAPER, AS WELL AS A METHOD AND A DEVICE FOR DETECTING FALSFICATION AND/OR FORGERY OF DOCUMENTS PRINTED ON SAID SECURITY PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Security Transfer B.V. Zilverstraat 2 8211 AN Lelystad / NL | [2005/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUINSTRA, Steven, Gerardus Teding van Berkhoutstraat 22 NL-3743 BV Baarn / NL | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2011/09] |
Former [2005/33] | de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 03774379.6 | 14.11.2003 | [2005/33] | WO2003NL00800 | Priority number, date | NL20021021956 | 20.11.2002 Original published format: NL 1021956 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004045864 | Date: | 03.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1562757 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/00 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
B42D25/29 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSPAPIER, VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM DETEKTIEREN VON FÄLSCHUNGEN UND/ ODER NACHMACHEN VON DOKUMENTEN GEDRUCKT MIT DIESEM PAPIER | [2005/33] | English: | A SECURITY PAPER, A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SECURITY PAPER, AS WELL AS A METHOD AND A DEVICE FOR DETECTING FALSFICATION AND/OR FORGERY OF DOCUMENTS PRINTED ON SAID SECURITY PAPER | [2005/33] | French: | PAPIER DE SECURITE, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN PAPIER DE SECURITE, AINSI QUE PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DETECTER TOUTE FALSIFICATION ET/OU CONTREFACON DE DOCUMENTS IMPRIMES SUR CE PAPIER DE SECURITE | [2005/33] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 03.11.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19832900 (A E HAUFFE GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1,10,15,17 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4114732 (BAYER HELMUT DR [DE], et al) [A] 1,10,15,17 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO0073582 (SECURITY TRANSFER B V [NL], et al) [DA] 1,10,15,17 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO0073582 |