EP1539795 - CRYSTALLINE 17BETA-HYDROXY-7ALPHA-(5'-METHYL-2'-FURYL)-PREGNA-4,9(11)-DIEN-3-ONE-21-CARBOXYLIC ACID, GAMMA-LACTONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 7000 Portage Road Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | [2007/04] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEARLMAN, Bruce, Allen 3411 Willow Lake Drive, 308 Kalamazoo, MI 49008 / US | 02 /
ANTOSZ, Frederick, J. 1089 N. 10th Street Kalamazoo, MI 49009 / US | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr. Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03774488.5 | 19.09.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US29923 | Priority number, date | US20020411874P | 19.09.2002 Original published format: US 411874 P | US20020425596P | 12.11.2002 Original published format: US 425596 P | US20030392833 | 21.03.2003 Original published format: US 392833 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004037844 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1539795 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1539795 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07J21/00 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
C07J1/00 (EP,US);
C07J21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRISTALLINES GAMMA-LACTON DER17BETA-HYDROXY-7ALPHA-(5'-METHYL-2'-FURYL)-PREGNA-4,9(11)-DIEN-3-ONE-21-CARBONSÄURE | [2005/24] | English: | CRYSTALLINE 17BETA-HYDROXY-7ALPHA-(5'-METHYL-2'-FURYL)-PREGNA-4,9(11)-DIEN-3-ONE-21-CARBOXYLIC ACID, GAMMA-LACTONE | [2005/24] | French: | GAMMA-LACTONE DE L'ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE 17BETA-HYDROXY-7ALPHA-(5'-METHYL-2'-FURYL)-PREGNA-4,9(11)-DIENE-3-ONE-21 | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 11.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.10.2007 | BE | 31.10.2007 | CH | 31.10.2007 | CY | 31.10.2007 | CZ | 31.10.2007 | DK | 31.10.2007 | EE | 31.10.2007 | FI | 31.10.2007 | LI | 31.10.2007 | NL | 31.10.2007 | RO | 31.10.2007 | SI | 31.10.2007 | SK | 31.10.2007 | TR | 31.10.2007 | BG | 31.01.2008 | SE | 31.01.2008 | GR | 01.02.2008 | PT | 31.03.2008 | HU | 01.05.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CY | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
HU | 01.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CY | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 31.10.2007 | |
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 31.10.2007 | |
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4559332 (GROB JUERGEN [CH], et al) [A] 1-11 * example 1 *; | [A]WO9721720 (SEARLE & CO [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9825948 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [E]WO03082894 (PHARMACIA CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-11 * Cpd (VII);; claim 187 * |