EP1554900 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ANTENNA STEERING FOR WLAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPR Licensing, Inc. 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza, Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [2009/11] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states IPR Licensing, Inc. 300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 527 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | ||
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states IPR Licensing, Inc. 300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 527 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFFMANN, John, E. 516 Latania Palm Drive Indialantic, FL 32903 / US | 02 /
NELSON, George, Rodney, Jr. 207 Sykes Loop Drive Merritt Island, FL 32953 / US | 03 /
REGNIER, John, A. 1621 Henley Road N.W. Palm Bay, FL 32907 / US | 04 /
JOHNSON, Kevin, P. 605 Pinehurst Circle NE Palm Bay, FL 32905 / US | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Andersson, Björn E., et al Awapatent AB Bellevuevägen 46 P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | Andersson, Björn, et al Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 03774516.3 | 30.09.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003US31035 | Priority number, date | US20020414946P | 30.09.2002 Original published format: US 414946 P | US20030479640P | 19.06.2003 Original published format: US 479640 P | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004030003 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1554900 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1554900 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1554900 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/28 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
H04B7/088 (EP,KR);
H04B7/0695 (EP,KR);
H04B7/0617 (KR);
H04W16/28 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2006/28] | H01Q3/26, H04Q7/36 | ||
Former IPC [2005/29] | H04Q7/24, H04M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANTENNENLENKUNG FÜR EIN WLAN | [2005/29] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ANTENNA STEERING FOR WLAN | [2005/29] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ORIENTATION D'ANTENNE POUR RESEAU LOCAL SANS FIL (WLAN) | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08154140.1 / EP1942555 | EP09179334.9 / EP2180738 | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.02.2009 | BE | 11.02.2009 | CY | 11.02.2009 | CZ | 11.02.2009 | DK | 11.02.2009 | EE | 11.02.2009 | NL | 11.02.2009 | RO | 11.02.2009 | SI | 11.02.2009 | SK | 11.02.2009 | TR | 11.02.2009 | BG | 11.05.2009 | GR | 12.05.2009 | PT | 11.07.2009 | HU | 12.08.2009 | [2012/41] |
Former [2011/44] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CY | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
TR | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
HU | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
HU | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
DK | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
BE | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 11.02.2009 | |
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | NL | 11.02.2009 | |
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | NL | 11.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001028639 (EIKELENBOOM ALBERT [NL], et al) [A] 1-27 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030]; figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036]; figure 5a * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0041] *; | [A]US2001031648 (PROCTOR JAMES ARTHUR [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0063] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A] - NASIPURI A ET AL, "A MAC protocol for mobile ad hoc networks using directional antennas", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERNCE, 2000. WCNC. 2000 IEEE 23-28 SEPTEMBER 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20000923), vol. 3, ISBN 0-7803-6596-8, pages 1214 - 1219, XP010532719 [A] 1-27 * page 1214 - page 1217; figures 2,3 * | [A] - FAHMY N S ET AL, "Ad hoc networks with smart antennas using IEEE 802.11-based protocols", ICC 2002. 2002 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. NEW YORK, NY, APRIL 28 - MAY 2, 2002, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020428), VOL. 1 OF 5, ISBN 0-7803-7400-2, pages 3144 - 3148, XP010590054 [A] 1-27 * page 3144 - page 3145 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.2002.997416 | International search | [Y]US2001028639 (EIKELENBOOM ALBERT [NL], et al); | [Y]US2001031648 (PROCTOR JAMES ARTHUR [US], et al); | [A]US6445688 (GARCES RODRIGO [US], et al) |