EP1556150 - INTEGRATED PRESSURIZED LIQUID EXTRACTION AND PURIFICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fluid Management Systems, Inc. 56-58 Felton Street Waltham, MA 02453 / US | [2005/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIRKHAN, Hamid 425 Waltham Street Newton, MA 02465 / US | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2005/30] | Winckels, J.H.F., Mr. Ir., et al Vereenigde, Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03774674.0 | 09.10.2003 | [2005/30] | WO2003US31893 | Priority number, date | US20020417324P | 09.10.2002 Original published format: US 417324 P | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004034021 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1556150 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01D11/02 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
G01N1/34 (EP,US);
B01D11/0207 (EP,US);
B01D11/028 (EP,US);
B01D15/00 (EP,US);
B01J20/08 (EP,US);
B01J20/103 (EP,US);
B01J20/20 (EP,US);
G01N1/4055 (EP,US);
G01N2001/4061 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/30] | B01D11/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE FLÜSSIGKEITSEXTRAKTION UNTERDRUCK UND REINIGUNGSSYSTEM | [2005/30] | English: | INTEGRATED PRESSURIZED LIQUID EXTRACTION AND PURIFICATION SYSTEM | [2005/30] | French: | SYSTEME INTEGRE D'EXTRACTION DE LIQUIDE SOUMIS A COMPRESSION ET DE PURIFICATION | [2005/30] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 17.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/46] | 07.10.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.11.2010 | 22.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9534360 (DIONEX CORP [US]) [X] 1-26 * page 18, line 10 - line 20; figure 1; example - *; | [A]WO9627417 (DIONEX CORP [US]) [A] * figure 1 *; | [A]US5601707 (CLAY DALE L [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * column 1, line 36 - line 44 * * column 2, line 46 - line 50 * * column 4, line 19 - line 22 * * column 10, line 59 - line 61 * * column 28, line 51 - line 56; figure 20 * | International search | [AP]US2003096422 (ONG ENG SHI [SG], et al) |