EP1562424 - MICROBICIDE SUBSTANCES CONTAINING BENZYLHEMIFORMAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WACHTLER, Peter Scheiblerstr. 85 47800 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
KUGLER, Martin Am Kloster 47 42799 Leichlingen / DE | [2005/33] | Application number, filing date | 03775233.4 | 25.10.2003 | [2005/33] | WO2003EP11885 | Priority number, date | DE2002151916 | 08.11.2002 Original published format: DE 10251916 | [2005/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004040979 | Date: | 21.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1562424 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1562424 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/80 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
A01N43/80 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/80, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N43/80, A01N35/02 (EP) |
Former IPC [2005/33] | A01N43/80, // A01N43:80, A01N35:02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BENZYLHEMIFORMAL ENTHALTENDE MIKROBIZIDE MITTEL | [2005/33] | English: | MICROBICIDE SUBSTANCES CONTAINING BENZYLHEMIFORMAL | [2005/33] | French: | SUBSTANCES MICROBICIDES CONTENANT DU BENZYLHEMIFORMAL | [2005/33] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 16.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.03.2009 | CZ | 04.03.2009 | DK | 04.03.2009 | EE | 04.03.2009 | FI | 04.03.2009 | IE | 04.03.2009 | RO | 04.03.2009 | SI | 04.03.2009 | SK | 04.03.2009 | TR | 04.03.2009 | BG | 04.06.2009 | SE | 04.06.2009 | GR | 05.06.2009 | PT | 19.08.2009 | HU | 05.09.2009 | LU | 25.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 04.03.2009 | |
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 19.08.2009 | ||
HU | 05.09.2009 | ||
LU | 25.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 04.03.2009 | |
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 19.08.2009 | ||
LU | 25.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | CZ | 04.03.2009 | |
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
PT | 19.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 04.03.2009 | |
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
PT | 19.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | CZ | 04.03.2009 | |
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
PT | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | CZ | 04.03.2009 | |
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
PT | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | FI | 04.03.2009 | |
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | FI | 04.03.2009 | |
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | FI | 04.03.2009 | |
SI | 04.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE4316845 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 40; claim - *; | [A]US6133300 (SMITH ROGER ERROL [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 5 - line 17 ** column 2, line 21 - line 43; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP1161867 (CREANOVA INC [US]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010]; claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP1245153 (BODE CHEMIE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0038]; claim 1 * |