EP1576186 - METHOD FOR GENERATING A GENETICALLY MODIFIED ORGANISM FOR SCREENING ACTIVE SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2011/18] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEBL, Bert Imhoffstrasse 16 82294 Günzlhofen / DE | 02 /
STADLER, Anja Kurt-Schumacherstrasse 18 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | 03 /
SÖLLNER, Rosemarie c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 04 /
LEBERER, Ekkehard Fichtenstrasse 82 B 82110 Germering / DE | 05 /
NITSCHE, Almut C/O Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2006/51] |
Former [2006/49] | 01 /
KLEBL, Bert Imhoffstrasse 16 82294 Günzlhofen / DE | ||
02 /
STADLER, Anja Kurt-Schumacherstrasse 18 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | |||
03 /
SÖLLNER, Rosemarie c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | |||
04 /
LEBERER, Ekkehard Fichtenstrasse 82 B 82110 Germering / DE | |||
05 /
NITSCHE, Almut Emanuel-Geibelstrasse 8 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | |||
Former [2005/38] | 01 /
KLEBL, Bert Imhoffstrasse 16 82294 Günzlhofen / DE | ||
02 /
STADLER, Anja Kurt-Schumacherstrasse 18 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | |||
03 /
SÖLLNER, Rosemarie Wurmseestrasse 60 81476 München / DE | |||
04 /
LEBERER, Ekkehard Fichtenstrasse 82 B 82110 Germering / DE | |||
05 /
NITSCHE, Almut Emanuel-Geibelstrasse 8 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 03775367.0 | 18.11.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003EP12870 | Priority number, date | DE2002158885 | 17.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10258885 | [2005/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004055206 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1576186 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1576186 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N1/00 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
C12N15/1086 (EP,KR,US);
A01K67/033 (KR);
C12N15/1072 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/1079 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/63 (KR);
C12N15/81 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/5082 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GENERIERUNG EINES GENTECHNISCH VERÄNDERTEN ORGANISMUS FÜR DAS WIRKSUBSTANZSCREENING | [2005/38] | English: | METHOD FOR GENERATING A GENETICALLY MODIFIED ORGANISM FOR SCREENING ACTIVE SUBSTANCES | [2005/38] | French: | PROCEDE POUR GENERER UN ORGANISME GENETIQUEMENT MODIFIE SERVANT AU CRIBLAGE D'UNE SUBSTANCE ACTIVE | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 10.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.05.2011 | CZ | 04.05.2011 | DK | 04.05.2011 | EE | 04.05.2011 | FI | 04.05.2011 | HU | 04.05.2011 | IE | 04.05.2011 | IT | 04.05.2011 | NL | 04.05.2011 | RO | 04.05.2011 | SE | 04.05.2011 | SI | 04.05.2011 | SK | 04.05.2011 | TR | 04.05.2011 | BG | 04.08.2011 | GR | 05.08.2011 | ES | 15.08.2011 | PT | 05.09.2011 | AT | 18.11.2011 | LU | 18.11.2011 | BE | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
TR | 04.05.2011 | ||
BG | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
AT | 18.11.2011 | ||
LU | 18.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
BG | 04.08.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
AT | 18.11.2011 | ||
LU | 18.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
AT | 18.11.2011 | ||
LU | 18.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
AT | 18.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2011 | ||
IT | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
DK | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
RO | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SK | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
CZ | 04.05.2011 | ||
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
EE | 04.05.2011 | ||
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
IE | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
NL | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
SI | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 04.05.2011 | |
FI | 04.05.2011 | ||
SE | 04.05.2011 | ||
GR | 05.08.2011 | ||
ES | 15.08.2011 | ||
PT | 05.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 05.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO02063029 (ICONIX PHARM INC [US]) [A] 1-21* page 6, line 7 - page 7, line 7; claim - *; | [PX]WO03016568 (VIRTEK PROTEOMICS INC [CA], et al) [PX] 1-9,11,12,15,17-21 * page 12, line 8 - page 24, line 17; claim - *; | [X] - TUGENDREICH STUART ET AL, "A streamlined process to phenotypically profile heterologous cDNAs in parallel using yeast cell-based assays", GENOME RESEARCH, (200111), vol. 11, no. 11, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 1899 - 1912, XP002272319 [X] 1-9,11,12,15,17-21 * Zusammenfassung; Diskussion; * * page 1900, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 2 * * page 1904, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 1905, column L, paragraph 2 * | [X] - CAUMONT ANNE B ET AL, "Expression of functional HIV-1 integrase in the yeast Saccharomyces cerevisiae leads to the emergence of a lethal phenotype: Potential use for inhibitor screening", CURRENT GENETICS, (1996), vol. 29, no. 6, ISSN 0172-8083, pages 503 - 510, XP002272320 [X] 1-9,11,12,15,17-21 * abstract * * Diskussion;; page 506, column R, paragraph 5 - page 507, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002940050078 | [X] - PAUSCH M H, "G-protein-coupled receptors in Saccharomyces cerevisiae: high-throughput screening assays for drug discovery", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (19971201), vol. 15, no. 12, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 487 - 494, XP004097426 [X] 1-9,11,12,15,17-21 * page 488, column R, paragraph 2 - page 491, column L, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-7799(97)01119-0 | [X] - ATIENZA J M ET AL, "Yeast Model System for Study of Mammalian Phosphodiesterases", METHODS: A COMPANION TO METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, (199801), vol. 14, no. 1, ISSN 1046-2023, pages 35 - 42, XP004466609 [X] 1-4,7-9,11,12,15,17-21 * page 35, column R, paragraph 2 - page 36, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 38, column R, paragraph 3 - page 39, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 41, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/meth.1997.0563 |