EP1682324 - METHOD AND PLANT FOR THE INTRODUCTION OF A LIQUID INTO A MOLTEN MASS UNDER PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MC, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prysmian S.p.A. Viale Sarca 222 20126 Milano / IT | [2008/49] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states Prysmian Cavi e Sistemi Energia S.r.l. Viale Sarca 222 20126 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALCONI, Luca c/o Pirelli & C. S.P.A. Via Negri 10 20123 Milano / IT | 02 /
DELL'ANNA, Gaia c/o Pirelli & C. S.P.A. Via Negri 10 20123 Milano / IT | 03 /
BAREGGI, Alberto c/o Pirelli & C. S.P.A. Via Negri 10 20123 Milano / IT | 04 /
BELLI, Sergio c/o Pirelli & C. S.P.A. Via Negri 10 20123 Milano / IT | [2016/32] |
Former [2006/30] | 01 /
BALCONI, Luca c/o Pirelli & C. S.P.A., Via Negri 10 20123 Milano / IT | ||
02 /
DELL'ANNA, Gaia c/o Pirelli & C. S.P.A., Via Negri 10 20123 Milano / IT | |||
03 /
BAREGGI, Alberto c/o Pirelli & C. S.P.A., Via Negri 10 20123 Milano / IT | |||
04 /
BELLI, Sergio c/o Pirelli & C. S.P.A., Via Negri 10 20123 Milano / IT | Representative(s) | Bottero, Claudio, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia 20 20135 Milano / IT | [2016/32] |
Former [2006/30] | Bottero, Claudio, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia, 20 20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03775806.7 | 31.10.2003 | [2006/30] | WO2003IT00704 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005042226 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1682324 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1682324 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/18, B29C47/10, H01B13/14, B01F5/04 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
H01B13/14 (EP,US);
B29C48/285 (KR);
B29B7/60 (EP,US);
B29B7/726 (EP,US);
B29B7/826 (EP,US);
B29B7/94 (EP,US);
B29C31/00 (KR);
B29C31/10 (KR);
B29C48/06 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/29 (EP,US);
B29B7/823 (EP,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
B29C48/2886 (EP,US);
B29C48/335 (EP,US);
B29C48/34 (EP,US);
B29K2101/10 (EP,US);
B29K2101/12 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0005 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0023 (EP,US);
B29K2105/16 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0005 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0006 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2006/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUM EINSPRITZEN EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT IN EINE UNTER DRUCK STEHENDE GESCHMOLZENE MASSE | [2014/18] | English: | METHOD AND PLANT FOR THE INTRODUCTION OF A LIQUID INTO A MOLTEN MASS UNDER PRESSURE | [2006/30] | French: | PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION D'INTRODUCTION D'UN LIQUIDE DANS UNE MASSE FONDUE SOUS PRESSION | [2006/30] |
Former [2006/30] | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUM EINSPRITZEN VON EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT IN EINEN UNTER DRUCK STEHENDEN MASSENSTROM | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 03.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.08.2016 | BE | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | IE | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | LU | 31.10.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/51] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
LU | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
LU | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0161857 (GEN ENG RADCLIFFE [GB]) [Y] 7 * page 1, line 1 - line 7 * * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 3; figure 1 *[A] 6; | [Y]EP0611250 (ICMA IND COSTR MAC AFFINI [IT]) [Y] 2,16,27 * column 1, line 1 - line 23 * * column 7, line 7 - line 11; claim 1 *; | [DXY]WO0247092 (PIRELLI CAVI E SISTEMI SPA [IT], et al) [DX] 1,3-6,8,9,11-15,19,20,24-26,28,31 * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 12 * * page 20, line 34 - page 21, line 2 * * page 23, line 19 - page 24, line 25; figure 2; claim 16 * [Y] 2,7,16,27 | Examination | US4289408 | EP0234074 |