EP1569060 - PART ORDERING SYSTEM AND PART ORDERING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., Ltd. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Yuuji, c/o Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1 Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | 02 /
Karou, Wataru, c/o Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1 Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2005/35] | Representative(s) | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 03775894.3 | 26.11.2003 | [2005/35] | WO2003JP15076 | Priority number, date | JP20020348588 | 29.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002348588 | [2005/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004051386 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1569060 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0633 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE [2005/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEILEBESTELLSYSTEM UND TEILEBESTELLVERFAHREN | [2005/35] | English: | PART ORDERING SYSTEM AND PART ORDERING METHOD | [2005/35] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE PIECES ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE PIECES | [2005/35] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2005 | Translation filed | 21.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 25.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/47] | 30.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [X]US2002042735 (NARAHARA KOICHI [JP], et al); | [Y]WO02089029 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) |