EP1554552 - BIREFRINGENCE MEASUREMENT OF LARGE-FORMAT SHEET OPTICAL ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/29] | BIREFRINGENCE MEASUREMENT OF LARGE-FORMAT SAMPLES | ||
[2010/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HINDS INSTRUMENTS, INC. 7245 NW Evergreen Pkwy Hillsboro OR 97124 / US | [2011/20] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Hinds Instruments, Inc. 3175 N.W. Aloclek Drive Hillsboro OR 97124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPLAN, Andrew, D. 735 SE Lexington St. Portland, OR 97202 / US | 02 /
MANSFIELD, James, C. 8370 SW Arthur Court Tigard OR 97223 / US | 03 /
MARK, Douglas, C. 11316 SW Ironwood Loop Tigard, OR 97223 / US | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/29] | 01 /
KAPLAN, Andrew, D. 735 SE Lexington St. Portland, OR 97202 / US | ||
02 /
MANSFIELD, James, C. 2515 NE Hyde St. Hillsboro, OR 97214 / US | |||
03 /
MARK, Douglas, C. 11316 SW Ironwood Loop Tigard, OR 97223 / US | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2005/29] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03776262.2 | 08.10.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003US32120 | Priority number, date | US20020419685P | 16.10.2002 Original published format: US 419685 P | US20030359529 | 05.02.2003 Original published format: US 359529 | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004036260 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1554552 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1554552 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/23, G01N21/95 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
G01N21/23 (EP,US);
G01J4/00 (KR);
G01N2021/9513 (EP,US);
G01N2201/101 (EP,US);
G01N2201/103 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/46] | G01J4/00, G01N21/01 | ||
Former IPC [2005/29] | G01J4/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOPPELBRECHUNGSMESSUNG VON GROSSFORMATIGEN OPTISCHEN ELEMENTEN | [2010/51] | English: | BIREFRINGENCE MEASUREMENT OF LARGE-FORMAT SHEET OPTICAL ELEMENTS | [2010/51] | French: | MESURE DE BIREFRINGENCE D'ELEMENTS OPTIQUES DE GRAND FORMAT | [2010/51] |
Former [2005/29] | DOPPELBRECHUNGSMESSUNG VON PROBEN MIT GROSSEM FORMAT | ||
Former [2005/29] | BIREFRINGENCE MEASUREMENT OF LARGE-FORMAT SAMPLES | ||
Former [2005/29] | MESURE DE BIREFRINGENCE D'ECHANTILLONS GRAND FORMAT | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 18.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2011 | BE | 15.06.2011 | CY | 15.06.2011 | CZ | 15.06.2011 | DK | 15.06.2011 | EE | 15.06.2011 | FI | 15.06.2011 | HU | 15.06.2011 | IT | 15.06.2011 | NL | 15.06.2011 | RO | 15.06.2011 | SE | 15.06.2011 | SI | 15.06.2011 | SK | 15.06.2011 | TR | 15.06.2011 | BG | 15.09.2011 | GR | 16.09.2011 | ES | 26.09.2011 | GB | 08.10.2011 | IE | 08.10.2011 | LU | 08.10.2011 | PT | 17.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | FR | 02.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
TR | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
GB | 08.10.2011 | ||
IE | 08.10.2011 | ||
LU | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
GB | 08.10.2011 | ||
IE | 08.10.2011 | ||
LU | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
GB | 08.10.2011 | ||
IE | 08.10.2011 | ||
LU | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
GB | 08.10.2011 | ||
IE | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
GB | 08.10.2011 | ||
IE | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
GB | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
GB | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2247047 (BISHOP JR FREDERIC L) [A] 1,4 * page 2, left hand col., lines 16-67 *; | [X]US4306808 (VANDER NEUT RICHARD D) [X] 1 * column 2, line 36 - line 65; figure 1 *; | [A]US4927236 (KEILMANN FRITZ [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US5769068 (TAKAHASHI KEI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * abstract; col. 2, lines 38-58; col. 3, lines 16-50, figures 1, 4, 5 * | International search | [A]US4313679 (WOLFF ERNEST G, et al); | [A]US5201141 (AHM POUL H [ES]); | [A]US5470757 (GAGNON JAMES E [US], et al); | [A]US5504581 (NAGATA SHINICHI [JP], et al); | [X]US5519218 (CHANG ON KOK [US]); | [A]US5898181 (VURENS GERARD H [US]); | [A]US5916425 (LEADER MATTHEW J [US], et al); | [A]US6061131 (IGUSHI TATSUO [JP], et al); | [A]US6141867 (FUKADA KAZUMITSU [JP], et al); | [X]US6317209 (PRIESTLEY RICHARD S [US]) |