EP1563308 - METHODS AND KITS FOR DIAGNOSING TUMORIGENICITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A & G Pharmaceutical, Inc. 9130 Red Branch Road Suite U/V Columbia, MD 21045 / US | [2006/21] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states A & G Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 9130 Red Branch Road, Suite U/V Baltimore, MD 21045 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SERRERO, Ginette 10200 Savoy Ct. Ellicott City, MD 21042 / US | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Pilkington, Stephanie Joan Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Pilkington, Stephanie Joan Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2005/33] | Pilkington, Stephanie Joan Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03776580.7 | 27.10.2003 | [2005/33] | WO2003US34146 | Priority number, date | US20020281160 | 28.10.2002 Original published format: US 281160 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004039244 | Date: | 13.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1563308 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1563308 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, C07K16/28 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
C07K14/475 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/22 (EP,US);
C07K16/28 (EP,US);
G01N33/57488 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/33] | G01N33/574, G01N33/53, G01N33/543, G01N33/563, A61K39/395, C07K16/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND KITS ZUR TUMORIGENIZITÄTSDIAGNOSE | [2005/33] | English: | METHODS AND KITS FOR DIAGNOSING TUMORIGENICITY | [2005/33] | French: | PROCEDES ET TROUSSES POUR DIAGNOSTIQUER UNE CANCEROGENICITE | [2005/33] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.10.2011 | CY | 19.10.2011 | CZ | 19.10.2011 | DK | 19.10.2011 | EE | 19.10.2011 | FI | 19.10.2011 | HU | 19.10.2011 | NL | 19.10.2011 | RO | 19.10.2011 | SE | 19.10.2011 | SI | 19.10.2011 | SK | 19.10.2011 | TR | 19.10.2011 | IE | 27.10.2011 | IT | 27.10.2011 | LU | 27.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | BG | 19.01.2012 | GR | 20.01.2012 | PT | 20.02.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
TR | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
IT | 27.10.2011 | ||
LU | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
IT | 27.10.2011 | ||
LU | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
IT | 27.10.2011 | ||
LU | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
IT | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
IT | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 27.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 19.10.2011 | |
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | NL | 19.10.2011 | |
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002025543 (SERRERO GINETTE [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002061859 (SERRERO GINETTE [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A] - LU R ET AL, "Mediation of estrogen mitogenic effect in human breast cancer MCF-7 cells by PC-cell-derived growth factor (PCDGF/granulin precursor).", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. 2 JAN 2001, (20010102), vol. 98, no. 1, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 142 - 147, XP002337169 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.011525198 | International search | [X]US6309826 (SERRERO GINETTE [US]) | by applicant | US5416192 | - SWERDLOW ET AL., BMJ, (1997), vol. 314, page 1507 | - KRONZ ET AL., CANCER, (19991201), vol. 86, no. 11, pages 2426 - 2435 |