EP1554207 - FOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2005/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOPPEL, Johannes Fantanesistr. 13 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
LEIDIG, Peter, Wilhelm, Kurt Ziegelhofweg 12 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2005/29] | Application number, filing date | 03776803.3 | 20.10.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003DE03469 | Priority number, date | DE2002148820 | 19.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10248820 | DE2003107089 | 19.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10307089 | DE2003122651 | 20.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10322651 | DE2003131469 | 11.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10331469 | [2005/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004037697 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1554207 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1554207 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/16, B65H45/30 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
B65H45/30 (EP,US);
B41F13/02 (EP,US);
B41F21/104 (EP,US);
B41F22/00 (EP,US);
B41F25/00 (EP,US);
B65H23/24 (EP,US);
B65H23/26 (EP,US);
B65H27/00 (EP,US);
B65H45/28 (EP,US);
B65H2301/522 (EP,US);
B65H2401/242 (EP,US);
B65H2406/111 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FALZAPPARAT | [2005/29] | English: | FOLDER | [2005/29] | French: | APPAREIL DE PLIAGE | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 08.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06100923.9 / EP1655257 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.08.2006 | CZ | 23.08.2006 | EE | 23.08.2006 | FI | 23.08.2006 | IE | 23.08.2006 | IT | 23.08.2006 | NL | 23.08.2006 | RO | 23.08.2006 | SI | 23.08.2006 | SK | 23.08.2006 | TR | 23.08.2006 | AT | 20.10.2006 | LU | 20.10.2006 | BE | 31.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | BG | 23.11.2006 | DK | 23.11.2006 | SE | 23.11.2006 | GR | 24.11.2006 | ES | 04.12.2006 | PT | 25.01.2007 | HU | 24.02.2007 | [2009/40] |
Former [2009/03] | CY | 23.08.2006 | |
CZ | 23.08.2006 | ||
EE | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
TR | 23.08.2006 | ||
AT | 20.10.2006 | ||
LU | 20.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
HU | 24.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 23.08.2006 | |
EE | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
TR | 23.08.2006 | ||
AT | 20.10.2006 | ||
LU | 20.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
HU | 24.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 23.08.2006 | |
EE | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
AT | 20.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
HU | 24.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 23.08.2006 | |
EE | 23.08.2006 | ||
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
AT | 20.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
AT | 20.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
GR | 24.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | CZ | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
AT | 20.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
RO | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
IE | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
SK | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
PT | 25.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 23.08.2006 | |
FI | 23.08.2006 | ||
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
NL | 23.08.2006 | ||
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
SI | 23.08.2006 | ||
BG | 23.11.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3245334 (LOUIS LONG CECIL) [A] 1-3,7-12,26-32 * column 4, line 12 - line 35 * * column 5, line 36 - line 40; figure 2 *; | [Y]DE2142902 (DORNIER AG) [Y] 1-3,7-13,15,18,19,21,26-31,37 * page 6, line 3 - page 8, line 4; figure 2 *; | [X]US4221596 (RICE HAL H) [X] 4 * figure 1 *; | [X]FR2456695 (PLIAGE SERVICE) [X] 4 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE2953538 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG) [A] 1,4* figure 1 *; | [X]US4701233 (BECK CHRISTIAN A [US], et al) [X] 4 * column 10, line 6 - line 26; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0364392 (BELOIT CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,7-12,26-32 * column 7, line 9 - line 11 *; | [A]EP0405023 (MOLL RICHARD JOSEPH [US]) [A] 5,38 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4234307 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,35 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE29501537U (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,7 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4410189 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1,22-25 * sentence 25 - sentence 54; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]DE19829095 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [Y] 1-3,7-13,15,18,19,21,26-31,37 * column 4, line 2 - line 5; figure 2 *; | [A]DE19829094 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1-3,7-13,15,21,23-31 * column 3, line 47 - line 52; figures 1-4 * |