EP1565490 - HOLO-TRANSCOBALAMINS BINDING PARTNERS AND THEIR USE IN COBALAMIN ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AXIS-SHIELD ASA Ulvenveien 87 0510 Oslo / NO | [2009/49] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states AXIS-SHIELD ASA Ulvenv 87 0581 Oslo 5 / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORNING, Lars Axis-Shield ASA Ulvenveien 87, 0510 Oslo / NO | 02 /
RIAN, Anne Axis-Shield PoC N-0504 Oslo / NO | [2005/34] | Representative(s) | Goddard, Christopher Robert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Goddard, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2005/34] | Goddard, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03777015.3 | 26.11.2003 | [2005/34] | WO2003GB05167 | Priority number, date | GB20020027544 | 26.11.2002 Original published format: GB 0227544 | GB20020028674 | 09.12.2002 Original published format: GB 0228674 | GB20030007727 | 03.04.2003 Original published format: GB 0307727 | [2005/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004048414 | Date: | 10.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1565490 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1565490 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, G01N33/82 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
G01N33/82 (EP,NO,US);
C07K16/18 (EP,NO,US);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K16/44 (EP,US);
G01N33/5735 (EP,US);
C07K2317/32 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] |
Former [2005/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOLO-TRANSCOBALAMIN BINDUNGSPARTNER UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN COBALAMINTEST | [2009/41] | English: | HOLO-TRANSCOBALAMINS BINDING PARTNERS AND THEIR USE IN COBALAMIN ASSAY | [2005/34] | French: | PARTENAIRES DU LIAISON DES HOLO-TRANSCOBALAMINES ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE TEST COBALAMINE | [2009/42] |
Former [2005/34] | HOLO-TRANSCOBALAMIN BINDUNGPARTNER UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN COBALAMINTEST | ||
Former [2005/34] | TITRAGE DE COBALAMINE | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 16.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Request for further processing for: | 08.11.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 08.11.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.11.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.05.2010 | EE | 05.05.2010 | LU | 26.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/31] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | CY | 05.05.2010 | |
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 05.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO0117659 (TUBOSCOPE I P INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0163297 (AXIS SHIELD ASA [NO], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [X]WO02086513 (AXIS SHIELD ASA [NO], et al) [X] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A] - ULLELAND M ET AL, "DIRECT ASSAY FOR COBALAMIN BOUND TO TRANSCOBALAMIN (HOLO-TRANSCOBALAMIN) IN SERUM", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY. WINSTON, US, (200203), vol. 48, no. 3, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 526 - 532, XP001145417 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * | by applicant | - GARAU ET AL., ACTA CRYST., (2001), vol. D_52, pages 1890 - 2 |