EP1606549 - ILLUMINATOR WITH PERISCOPIC OPTICAL GUIDANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flos S.P.A. Via A. Faini, 2 25087 Bovezzo / IT | [2005/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRESCIANI, Fulvio Strada Valore 135 I-14020 Aramengo / IT | 02 /
CARDILE, Tiziana Via Quart 8 I-10139 Torino / IT | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Sangiacomo, Fulvia, et al Biesse S.r.l. Via Corfù, 71 25124 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Sangiacomo, Fulvia, et al BIESSE S.R.L., Corso Matteotti 42 25122 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 03777025.2 | 09.12.2003 | [2005/51] | WO2003IB05375 | Priority number, date | IT2002TO01077 | 11.12.2002 Original published format: IT TO20021077 | [2005/51] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004053386 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1606549 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F21S6/00, F21V7/00, F21S8/08 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
F21S6/002 (EP,US);
F21S8/00 (KR);
F21S6/00 (KR);
F21S8/088 (EP,US);
F21V7/0008 (EP,US);
G02B6/0001 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSEINRICHTUNG MIT PERISKOPISCHEM, OPTISCHEM LEITSYSTEM | [2005/51] | English: | ILLUMINATOR WITH PERISCOPIC OPTICAL GUIDANCE | [2005/51] | French: | ILLUMINATEUR A GUIDAGE OPTIQUE PERISCOPIQUE | [2005/51] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2004 | Translation filed | 09.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 27.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/18] | 20.12.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/18] | Request for further processing for: | 12.03.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 09.03.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.04.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4337506 (TERADA JAMES I) [X] 1,10,11,14,15 * column 3, line 40 - line 51 * * column 4, line 3 - line 12 * * figure 1 *; | [X]FR2534795 (MOLE RICHARDSON FRANCE SA [FR]) [X] 1,10,11,14,15 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 37 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5134550 (YOUNG RICHARD A [US]) [X] 1-13 * column 2, line 36 - line 55 * * column 3, line 1 - line 7 * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 9 * * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 3 * * figures 1,5-11 *; | [X]US5575550 (APPELDORN ROGER H [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 3, line 43 - line 55 * * column 5, line 37 - line 59 ** figures 1,7-9 *; | [X]DE19616461 (LEBER HERMANN [DE]) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 12 * * figures 1,2,5; claims 1-9 *; | [X]DE19540368 (BRAUN UWE PETER DIPL ING FH [DE]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1-6; claims 1,2,4,5,7,8 *; | [X]DE19822963 (HOLZER WALTER [DE]) [X] 1,10,11,14,15 * column 2, line 40 - line 65 * * figure 1 * |