EP1573663 - SMART CARD WITH NON-VOLATILE DISPLAY USING TEMPERATURE-SENSITIVE ELECTRONIC INK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/31] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLEUNIS, John 1109 McKay Drive, M/S-41SJ San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Röggla, Harald NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 1101 Vienna / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Röggla, Harald NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 1102 Vienna / AT | ||
Former [2007/50] | Röggla, Harald NXP Semiconductors Austria GmbH Gutheil-Schoder-Gasse 8-12 1102 Vienna / AT | ||
Former [2007/01] | Röggla, Harald, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Triester Strasse 64 1101 Vienna / AT | ||
Former [2005/37] | Eleveld, Koop Jan Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03777068.2 | 10.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003IB05867 | Priority number, date | US20020432891P | 12.12.2002 Original published format: US 432891 P | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004053786 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1573663 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1573663 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/07, G06K19/06 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
G06K19/07703 (EP);
G06K19/07 (EP,KR);
B41J3/4076 (EP);
G06K1/12 (EP);
G06K19/06046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SMARTCARD MIT NICHTFLÜCHTIGER ANZEIGE AUF DER BASIS TEMPERATUREMPFINDLICHER ELEKTRONISCHER TINTE | [2005/37] | English: | SMART CARD WITH NON-VOLATILE DISPLAY USING TEMPERATURE-SENSITIVE ELECTRONIC INK | [2005/37] | French: | CARTE A PUCE A AFFICHAGE REMANENT UTILISANT UNE ENCRE ELECTRONIQUE SENSIBLE A LA TEMPERATURE | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 24.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.04.2007 | BE | 04.04.2007 | CH | 04.04.2007 | CY | 04.04.2007 | CZ | 04.04.2007 | DK | 04.04.2007 | EE | 04.04.2007 | FI | 04.04.2007 | LI | 04.04.2007 | NL | 04.04.2007 | RO | 04.04.2007 | SI | 04.04.2007 | SK | 04.04.2007 | TR | 04.04.2007 | BG | 04.07.2007 | SE | 04.07.2007 | GR | 05.07.2007 | ES | 15.07.2007 | PT | 04.09.2007 | HU | 05.10.2007 | IE | 10.12.2007 | LU | 10.12.2007 | IT | 31.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2011/12] |
Former [2009/43] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
TR | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
HU | 05.10.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
LU | 10.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
LU | 10.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | SI | 04.04.2007 | |
ES | 15.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2001338273 ; | [X]WO9722084 (BEYER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 5 * page 2, lines 6-22 * * abstract *; | [A]FR2788359 (LEROUX GILLES SA [FR]) [A] 1,5,8 * page 1, line 17 - page 2, line 30 * * page 4, line 18 - page 6, line 24 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE19958333 (BARTELS MIKROTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,5,8* column 17, lines 1-19; figure 15B *; | [A]US2002030638 (WEINER MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1,5,8 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0029] , [0030] , [0046]; figure 8 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020804), vol. 2002, no. 04, & JP2001338273 A 20011207 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 5 * abstract * | Examination | US2002167500 |