EP1586072 - METHOD OF BINARISING IMAGES CONTAINING LINEAR STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/42] | METHOD OF BINARIZING IMAGES CONTAINING LINEAR STRUCTURES | ||
[2006/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/30] |
Former [2006/29] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2005/42] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIER, Reinhard, Philips Int. Prop. & Stand. GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Volmer, Georg Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH, Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03777108.6 | 15.12.2003 | [2005/42] | WO2003IB06034 | Priority number, date | EP20030100025 | 09.01.2003 Original published format: EP 03100025 | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004063975 | Date: | 29.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1586072 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1586072 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/38 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
G06V40/1347 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BINÄRISIERUNG VON LINEARESTRUKTUREN ENTHALTENDEN BILDERN | [2006/42] | English: | METHOD OF BINARISING IMAGES CONTAINING LINEAR STRUCTURES | [2006/42] | French: | MÉTHODE POUR BINARISER DES IMAGES CONTENANT DES STRUCTURES LINEAIRES | [2006/42] |
Former [2005/42] | VERFAHREN ZUR BINûRISIERUNG VON LINEARESTRUKTUREN ENTHALTENDEN BILDERN | ||
Former [2005/42] | METHOD OF BINARIZING IMAGES CONTAINING LINEAR STRUCTURES | ||
Former [2005/42] | PROCEDE POUR BINARISER DES IMAGES CONTENANT DES STRUCTURES LINEAIRES | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.04.2007 | BE | 04.04.2007 | CH | 04.04.2007 | CY | 04.04.2007 | CZ | 04.04.2007 | DK | 04.04.2007 | EE | 04.04.2007 | FI | 04.04.2007 | IT | 04.04.2007 | LI | 04.04.2007 | NL | 04.04.2007 | RO | 04.04.2007 | SI | 04.04.2007 | SK | 04.04.2007 | TR | 04.04.2007 | BG | 04.07.2007 | SE | 04.07.2007 | GR | 05.07.2007 | ES | 15.07.2007 | PT | 04.09.2007 | HU | 05.10.2007 | LU | 15.12.2007 | IE | 17.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
LU | 15.12.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | SI | 04.04.2007 | |
ES | 15.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [PA]WO03079274 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [PA] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XY] - HONG L ET AL, FINGERPRINT IMAGE ENHANCEMENT: ALGORITHM AND PERFORMANCE EVALUATION, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, VOL. 20, NR. 8, PAGE(S) 777-789, ISSN 0162-8828, XP000774452 [X] 1,8,9,12-15 * page 779, section 1, pages 780-784, sections 2.2 - 2.7 * * pages 780-781, section 2.4 * [Y] 2-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.709565 | [Y] - KASAER S ET AL, Fingerprint feature enhancement using block-direction on reconstructed images, INFORMATION, COMMUNICATIONS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1997. ICICS., PROCEEDINGS OF 1997 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SINGAPORE 9-12 SEPT. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, PAGE(S) 721-725, ISBN 0-7803-3676-3, XP010263901 [Y] 2-7 * page 723, section 2.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICICS.1997.652072 | [A] - LIN W-C ET AL, A REVIEW OF RIDGE COUNTING IN DERMATOGLYPHICS, PATTERN RECOGNITION, PERGAMON PRESS INC. ELMSFORD, N.Y, US, VOL. 16, NR. 1, PAGE(S) 1-8, ISSN 0031-3203, XP002038238 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-3203(83)90002-X |