EP1570971 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING THERMOPLASTIC SYNTHETIC RESIN SHEET OR FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTE CO., LTD. 310, Aza Yanagimiya Oaza Kouguki Kisai-machi Kitasaitama-gun, Saitama 347-0111 / JP | [2005/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORITA, Keita 601, Clio Ageo Ichibankan 7-13, Naka-cho 1-chome Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0035 / JP | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingeisen & Partner Bräuhausstrasse 2 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/02] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/36] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Zumstein & Klingseisen Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03777170.6 | 01.12.2003 | [2005/36] | WO2003JP15320 | Priority number, date | JP20020361032 | 12.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002361032 | [2005/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004052620 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1570971 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/88 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
B29C55/18 (EP,US);
B29C43/222 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/91 (EP,US);
B29C48/914 (EP,US);
B29C48/9145 (EP,US);
B29C48/919 (EP,US);
B29C48/92 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92647 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92704 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92923 (EP,US);
B29C59/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/36] | B29C47/88, // B29L7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/14] |
Former [2005/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON THERMOPLASTISCHER KUNSTHARZFOLIE ODER THERMOPLASTISCHEM KUNSTHARZFILM | [2005/36] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING THERMOPLASTIC SYNTHETIC RESIN SHEET OR FILM | [2005/36] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION D'UNE FEUILLE OU D'UN FILM DE RESINE SYNTHETIQUE THERMOPLASTIQUE | [2005/36] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2005 | Translation filed | 21.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 21.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 20.11.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0614748 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1,6 * page 7, line 18 - line 41; figure 1 *; | [A]US5707478 (FUJII ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 6 * column 5, line 54 - line 56; figure 5 *; | [A]GB2323057 (SEIDE ADOLF [DE]) [A] 1,6 * page 6, line 26 - line 33 * * page 8, line 26 - line 31; figures 1,2a *; | [A]WO9912722 (MIKKELSEN OEYSTEIN [US]) [A] 6 * page 13, line 8 - line 12; figure 4 *; | [A] - MIETHLINGER J, "HOCHTRANSPARENTE FOLIEN HERSTELLEN SPEZIELLE FOLIENEIGENSCHAFTEN MITTELS SLEEVE-TOUCH-FLAECHENGLAETTUNG", KUNSTSTOFFE, CARL HANSER VERLAG, MUNCHEN, DE, (20011101), vol. 91, no. 11, ISSN 0023-5563, pages 78 - 83, XP001103554 [A] 1,6 * figure 4 * | International search | [A]JPH06166089 (AIPETSUKU KK, et al); | [A]JPH06170919 (AIPETSUKU KK, et al); | [A]US5674442 (MORITA KEITA [JP]); | [A]EP0838321 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) |