EP1560241 - MULTI-OPTICAL AXIS PHOTOELECTRIC SWITCH, MOUNTING STRUCTURE THEREOF, AND MOUNTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sunx Limited 2431-1, Ushiyama-cho Kasugai-shi Aichi 486-0901 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states Sunx Limited 2431-1, Ushiyama-cho Kasugai-shi, Aichi 486-0901 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIGUCHI, Yoshihiro c/o Sunx Limited 2431-1, Ushiyama-cho Kasugai-shi, Aichi 486-0901 / JP | 02 /
NANBA, Ryousuke c/o SUNX Limited 2431-1, Ushiyama-cho Kasugai-shi, Aichi 486-0901 / JP | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03777370.2 | 09.12.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003JP15698 | Priority number, date | JP20030163018 | 06.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003163018 | [2005/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004109735 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1560241 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01V8/20, H01H35/00 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
G01V8/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/31] | H01H35/00, G01V8/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHOTOELEKTRISCHER SCHALTER MIT MEHREREN OPTISCHEN ACHSEN,ANBRINGSTRUKTUR DAFÜR UND ANBRINGWERKZEUG | [2005/31] | English: | MULTI-OPTICAL AXIS PHOTOELECTRIC SWITCH, MOUNTING STRUCTURE THEREOF, AND MOUNTING TOOL | [2005/31] | French: | COMMUTATEUR PHOTOELECTRIQUE A AXE MULTIOPTIQUE, ET OUTIL ET STRUCTURE DE MONTAGE ASSOCIES | [2005/31] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2004 | Translation filed | 01.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 03.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 03.12.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0394582U (SANSEI DENKAN KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [X] 1-20 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]JP2002158575 (SUNX LTD) [A] 1-20* abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH0326026U ; | [Y]JPH0718218Y ; | [Y]JP2002042619 (SUNX LTD); | [A]JPH11329180 (KEYENCE CO LTD); | [A]JP2002250910 (IKEGAMI TSUSHINKI KK); | [A]JPS515668U |