EP1571909 - OPTIMIZED MULTI-EPITOPE CONSTRUCTS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDM Pharma, Inc. 5820 Nancy Ridge Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | For all designated states GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto California 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states IDM Pharma, Inc. 5820 Nancy Ridge Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
For all designated states GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto California 94304 / US | |||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Epimmune Inc. 5820 Nancy Ridge Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
For all designated states GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SETTE, Alessandro 5551 Linda Rosa Avenue La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 02 /
CHESNUT, Robert 1473 Kings Cross Drive Cardiff-by-the-Sea, CA 92007 / US | 03 /
NEWMAN, Mark J. 6603A Santa Isabel Street Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 04 /
LIVINGSTON, Brian D. 13555 Chaco Court San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 05 /
BABE, Lilia Maria 812 Bayview Way Emerald Hills, CA 94062 / US | 06 /
CHEN, Yiyou 6434 Menlo Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 07 /
DEYOUNG, Lawrence M. 991 Elm Street Montara, CA 94037 / US | 08 /
HUANG, Manley T.F. 504 El Capitan Place Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 09 /
POWER, Scott D. 524 Poplar Avenue San Bruno, CA 94066 / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03777539.2 | 03.10.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003US31303 | Priority number, date | US20020415463P | 03.10.2002 Original published format: US 415463 P | US20020419973P | 22.10.2002 Original published format: US 419973 P | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004031210 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1571909 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01N63/00, C12N7/00, C07H21/04, C07K14/02, A61K39/29 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
A61K39/292 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61P31/20 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N15/11 (KR);
C12N15/117 (KR);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55555 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6031 (EP,US);
A61K2039/605 (EP,US);
A61K2039/645 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/37] | A01N63/00, C12N7/00, C07H21/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTIMIERTE MULTIEPITOP-KONSTRUKTE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAFÜR | [2005/37] | English: | OPTIMIZED MULTI-EPITOPE CONSTRUCTS AND USES THEREOF | [2005/37] | French: | CONSTRUCTIONS OPTIMISEES A PLUSIEURS EPITOPES ET UTILISATIONS DE CES DERNIERES | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 01.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/43] | 10.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.2010 | 31.10.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0219986 (EPIMMUNE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10,12-17 * claims 1-29; tables 7-38 *; | [A]US2002119127 (SETTE ALESSANDRO [US], et al) [A] 1-5,9,10,12-17 * figures 3,18H,19D *; | [E]WO2005033265 (EPIMMUNE INC [US], et al) [E] 1,9* figures 27A,27B,29A,29B; claims 1-5; table 13 *; | [A] - LIVINGSTON B D ET AL, "Optimization of epitope processing enhances immunogenicity of multiepitope DNA vaccines", VACCINE, (20010914), vol. 19, no. 32, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 4652 - 4660, XP004303157 [A] 1-5,9,10,12-17 * figures 1b,1c * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(01)00233-X | International search | [A] - SOBAO Y., "Identification of hepatitis B virus-specific CTL epitopes presented by HLA-A*2402, the most common HLA class I allele in East Asia", J. HEPATOL., (2001), vol. 34, pages 922 - 929, XP002978703 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-8278(01)00048-4 | [A] - OSEROFF C., "Pools of lipidated HTL-CTL constructs prime for multiple HBV and HCV CTL epitope responses", VACCINE, (1998), vol. 16, no. 8, pages 823 - 833, XP004118491 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(97)00264-8 |