EP1559079 - FLOOR DISPLAY SYSTEM WITH VARIABLE IMAGE ORIENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IntelliMat, Inc. 3959 Electric Road Suite 330 Roanoke VA 24018 / US | [2008/45] |
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states IntelliMats, LLC 2840 Hershberger Road, Suite A Roanoke, VA 24017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLUM, Ronald, D. 5320 Silver Fox Road Roanoke, VA 24014 / US | 02 /
THIBODEAU, Joseph, A. 8204 Pasquel Flower Place Lorton, Virginia 22079-5681 / US | 03 /
KOKONASKI, William 1807 44th Street Court, N.W. Gig Harbor, WA 98335 / US | 04 /
KATZMAN, Youval Yigal Alon St. P.O. Box 5271 30900 Zichron Yaaqov / IL | 05 /
HARARI, Boaz 135 Aba Hushi Av. 34987 Haifa / IL | 06 /
GREENBERG, Kobby 6, Hgiva St. P.O. Box 1702 40500 Even-Yehuda / IL | [2007/07] |
Former [2005/31] | 01 /
BLUM, Ronald, D. 5320 Silver Fox Road Roanoke, VA 24014 / US | ||
02 /
THIBODEAU, Joseph, A. 3263 White Oak Road Roanoke, VA 24014 / US | |||
03 /
KOKONASKI, William 1807 44th Street Court, N.W. Gig Harbor, WA 98335 / US | |||
04 /
KATZMAN, Youval Yigal Alon St. P.O. Box 5271 30900 Zichron Yaaqov / IL | |||
05 /
HARARI, Boaz 135 Aba Hushi Av. 34987 Haifa / IL | |||
06 /
GREENBERG, Kobby 6, Hgiva St. P.O. Box 1702 40500 Even-Yehuda / IL | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03777576.4 | 10.10.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003US32403 | Priority number, date | US20020418626P | 12.10.2002 Original published format: US 418626 P | US20020285639 | 01.11.2002 Original published format: US 285639 | US20020428387P | 21.11.2002 Original published format: US 428387 P | US20020429044P | 23.11.2002 Original published format: US 429044 P | US20030438923 | 16.05.2003 Original published format: US 438923 | [2005/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004036292 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1559079 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/00, G09F19/22, G09F27/00 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
G09F9/30 (EP);
G09F9/3023 (KR);
G09F19/22 (KR);
G09F19/228 (EP);
G09F2019/223 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2005/31] | G08B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BODENANZEIGESYSTEM MIT VARIABLER BILDORIENTIERUNG | [2005/31] | English: | FLOOR DISPLAY SYSTEM WITH VARIABLE IMAGE ORIENTATION | [2005/31] | French: | SYTEME D'AFFICHAGE AU SOL A ORIENTATON D'IMAGE VARIABLE | [2010/39] |
Former [2005/31] | SYSTEME AFFICHEUR DE SOL A ORIENTATION D'IMAGE VARIABLE | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 17.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/32] | 09.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4720789 (HECTOR ROGER D [US], et al) [Y] 6-8 * column 3, line 26 - line 68 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]US5913727 (AHDOOT NED [US]) [X] 1,5,11 * column 4, line 46 - line 52 * * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 57 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 4,6-8,10; | [Y]DE20015559U (LAUSCH HOLGER [DE]) [Y] 4,10 * page 6, line 20 - line 36 ** figures 1,2 * | International search | [X]US4720789 (HECTOR ROGER D [US], et al); | [X]US5646818 (HAHN KARL-HEINZ [DE]); | [X]US5703564 (BEGUM PAUL G [US], et al); | [X]US5816550 (WATANABE NOBORU [JP], et al); | [X]US5839976 (DARR ELSIE A [US]); | [X]US5848830 (CASTLE PETER L [CA], et al); | [X]US5971761 (TILLMAN SR CHITUNDA [US]); | [X]US6417778 (BLUM RONALD D [US], et al) | by applicant | US5913727 |