EP1565260 - GAS CLEANING PROCESS AND EQUIPMENT THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLEAN GAS TECHNOLOGIES LTD. 8 Little Aston Lane Little Aston Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B74 3UF / GB | [2013/36] |
Former [2013/35] | For all designated states ArcelorMittal South Africa Limited Roger Dyason Street Pretoria West 0183 / ZA | ||
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states Mittal Steel South Africa Limited Roger Dyason Street 0183 Pretoria West / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAXTON, Richard, George Moor View 8 Little Aston Lane Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B74 3UF / GB | 02 /
FELLOWS-SMITH, Michael 5 miles Sharp Street Rynfield 1501 Benoni / ZA | 03 /
MINSZENTY, Friedrich, Michael 32 Somerset Road Kensington 2094 Johannesburg / ZA | 04 /
MINSZENTY, Christian, Alexander 32 Somerset Road Kensington 2094 Johannesburg / ZA | [2013/42] |
Former [2005/34] | 01 /
PAXTON, Richard, George Moor View 8 Little Aston Lane Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B74 3UF / GB | ||
02 /
FELLOWS-SMITH, Michael 5 miles Sharp Street Rynfield 1501 Benoni / ZA | |||
03 /
MINSZENTY, Friedrich, Michael 32 Somerset Road Kensington 2094 Johannesburg / ZA | |||
04 /
MINSZENTY, Christian, Alexander 32 Somerset Road Kensington 2094 Johannesburg / ZA | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2013/42] |
Former [2008/29] | Price, Nigel John King, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/10] | Price, Nigel John King, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/34] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03778156.4 | 29.10.2003 | [2005/34] | WO2003ZA00160 | Priority number, date | ZA20020008730 | 29.10.2002 Original published format: ZA 200208730 | [2005/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004039492 | Date: | 13.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1565260 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1565260 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/24, B01F5/06, C08K3/14 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
B01D47/00 (EP,US);
B01D51/02 (EP,US);
C22B1/16 (EP,US);
C22B7/02 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/34] | Extension states | AL | 02.05.2005 | LT | 02.05.2005 | LV | 02.05.2005 | MK | 02.05.2005 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GASREINIGUNG | [2005/34] | English: | GAS CLEANING PROCESS AND EQUIPMENT THEREFOR | [2005/34] | French: | PROCESSUS DE NETTOYAGE DE GAZ ET EQUIPEMENT CONCERNE | [2005/34] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 11.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2003 | AT | 16.10.2013 | BE | 16.10.2013 | BG | 16.10.2013 | CY | 16.10.2013 | CZ | 16.10.2013 | EE | 16.10.2013 | ES | 16.10.2013 | IT | 16.10.2013 | MC | 16.10.2013 | RO | 16.10.2013 | SI | 16.10.2013 | SK | 16.10.2013 | TR | 16.10.2013 | LU | 29.10.2013 | GR | 17.01.2014 | PT | 17.02.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/38] | HU | 29.10.2003 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
GR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
TR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LU | 29.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 29.10.2003 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
TR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LU | 29.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
TR | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 16.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9429017 (ATOMAER PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-47 * abstract * * page 5, line 1 - line 36; figure 1 * * page 14, line 16 - line 36; figure 7 *; | [A]EP0608902 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-47 * abstract * * page 8, line 36 - page 9, line 9; figures 3-12 *; | [X]US4551496 (RENLUND GARY M [US], et al) [X] 48-56 * abstract * * column 2, line 53 - line 55 * * column 3, line 47 - line 54 * * claim 1 *; | [X]DE10036499 (NOMIG GMBH [DE]) [X] 48-56 * column 1, line 35 - line 63 * * claims 1,4,5 *; | [X]GB942756 (KALLE AG) [X] 48-56 * page 1, line 10 - line 12 * * page 2, line 37 - line 49 * * page 3, line 128 - page 4, line 1 * * example 1 * * claim 1 *; | [A]DE2457446 (METZELER KAUTSCHUK) [A] 50 * page 4 * * claim 1 * |