EP1570013 - AQUEOUS CHROMOPHORE AND/OR EFFECT-PRODUCING COATING MATERIAL, AND USE OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Coatings GmbH Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | [2010/16] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAPPER, Götz-Ekkehard Christmas Cottage High Street Godshill I.O.W. P0383HH / GB | 02 /
HUMMERT, Tobias Altenbergstr. 13 97261 Güntersleben / DE | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Steffan & Kiehne Patentanwälte PartG mbB Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/33] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2005/36] | Fitzner, Uwe Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03778299.2 | 05.11.2003 | [2005/36] | WO2003EP12310 | Priority number, date | DE20021057377 | 09.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10257377 | [2005/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004053007 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1570013 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09D175/04, C08G18/66, C08G18/67, C08G18/79, C08F290/14, C08G18/08, C09D151/08, C08L33/02, C08L51/08, C08F283/00 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
C08L33/02 (EP,US);
C08F283/006 (EP,US);
C08F290/147 (EP,US);
C08G18/0823 (EP,US);
C08G18/664 (EP,US);
C08G18/675 (EP,US);
C08G18/792 (EP,US);
C08L51/08 (EP,US);
C09D151/08 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L33/02, C08L2666/24 (EP,US);
C08L51/08, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C09D151/08, C08L2666/02 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/36] | C09D175/04, C08G18/66, C08G18/67, C08G18/79, C08F290/14, C08G18/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGER FARB- UND/ODER EFFEKTGEBENDER BESCHICHTUNGSSTOFF UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2005/36] | English: | AQUEOUS CHROMOPHORE AND/OR EFFECT-PRODUCING COATING MATERIAL, AND USE OF THE SAME | [2005/36] | French: | SUBSTANCE DE REVETEMENT AQUEUSE CONFERANT UN ASPECT CHROMATIQUE ET/OU UN EFFET SPECIAL, ET SON UTILISATION | [2005/36] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 05.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/52] | 09.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0589340 (BASF CORP [US]) [DA] 1-11 * page 7, line 21 - line 26; examples 1,5,7 *; | [DA]DE4437535 (BASF LACKE & FARBEN [DE]) [DA] 1-11 * page 7, line 59 - page 8, line 23 * * page 9; example III *; | [DA]DE19722862 (BASF COATINGS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-11 * examples 1-3 *; | [A]US5854332 (SWARUP SHANTI [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * examples I,XI * |