EP1576243 - BUILDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spaceover Group Limited Maitlands, Faygate Lane Faygate West Sussex RH12 4SJ / GB | [2006/49] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states Spaceover Ltd. Woodbridge House, Chapel Road Smallfield Surrey RH6 9NW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRETT, Steven, John 7 Park Road Burgess Hill, West Sussex RH15 8EU / GB | 02 /
PREWER, John, Russell The Studio, 71 Chapel Lane Bapchild, Nr. Sittingbourne, Kent ME9 9NH / GB | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Moore, Christopher Mark, et al Avidity IP Kestrel House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Moore, Christopher Mark, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/46] | Moore, Christopher Mark, et al HLBBshaw 10th Floor 1 Hagley Road Birmingham B16 8TG / GB | ||
Former [2005/38] | Symons, Rupert Jonathan, et al HLBBshaw 10th Floor 1 Hagley Road Birmingham B16 8TG / GB | Application number, filing date | 03778522.7 | 26.11.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003GB05148 | Priority number, date | GB20020027564 | 26.11.2002 Original published format: GB 0227564 | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004048714 | Date: | 10.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1576243 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/38, E04C2/04 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
E04C2/28 (EP,GB);
B28B19/00 (EP);
B28B23/02 (EP);
E04C2/384 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEBÄUDE | [2005/38] | English: | BUILDING | [2005/38] | French: | BATIMENT | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 01.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/14] | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB567099 (GEORGE MCLEAN GIBSON); | [X]US3867800 (ELLIOTT ROBERT GORDON); | [Y]FR2250912 (BRITISH SCREW CO LTD [GB]); | [Y]FR2318982 (MAHLE GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0096118 (DEBREMAEKER EGIDE JOZEF [BE], et al); | [XAY]US4525965 (WOELFEL JOHN [US]) | by applicant | US3604174 | US3604170 | US3760540 |