EP1579771 - WATER-BASED SHELLAC COATING MATERIAL, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, COATED FOOD OBTAINED WITH THE COATING MATERIAL, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, COATED MEDICINE, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, GLAZING COMPOSITION FOR OILY SNACK, METHOD OF GLAZING, AND GLAZED OILY SNACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freund Corporation 34F Oak Tower, 8-1, Nishishinjuku 6-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-6034 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Freund Corporation 34F Oak Tower, 8-1, Nishishinjuku 6-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-6034 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHOBU, Tomoyuki, c/o Freund Corporation Hamamatsu Office, 2-2, Shinmiyakoda 1-chome Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-2103 / JP | 02 /
IGUSA, Kazuo, c/o Freund Corporation Hamamatsu Office, 2-2, Shinmiyakoda 1-chome Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-2103 / JP | 03 /
OGASAWARA, Toshichika, c/o Freund Corporation Hamamatsu Office, 2-2, Shinmiyakoda 1-chome Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 431-2103 / JP | 04 /
MOCHIZUKI, Keizou 12-20, Hinode-cho, Sakado-shi Saitama 350-0225 / JP | 05 /
YAMADA, Kazumi, c/o Freund Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-10, Namakage 2-chome, Saitama-shi Saitama 366-0027 / JP | 06 /
HARA, Hidejiro, c/o Freund Corporation 34F Oak-Tower, 8-1, Nishishinjuku 6-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-6034 / JP | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03778745.4 | 26.11.2003 | [2005/39] | WO2003JP15097 | Priority number, date | JP20020347465 | 29.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002347465 | JP20030176333 | 20.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003176333 | JP20030293002 | 13.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003293002 | JP20030318500 | 10.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003318500 | [2005/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004049820 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1579771 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/00, A61K9/34, A23G3/00, A23G1/00 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
A23G3/343 (EP);
A23G1/00 (KR);
A23G1/305 (EP);
A23G3/00 (KR);
A23P20/11 (EP);
A61K9/28 (KR);
A61K9/2813 (EP);
A61K9/282 (EP);
A61K9/2833 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23G1/305, A23G2200/00 (EP);
A23G1/305, A23G2200/06 (EP);
A23G3/343, A23G2200/00 (EP);
A23G3/343, A23G2200/06 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHELLACK-BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIALIEN AUF WASSERBASIS, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG, MIT DEM BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIAL BESCHICHTETE NAHRUNGSMITTEL, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG, BESCHICHTETES ARZNEIMITTEL, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG,GLANZBESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR ÖLHALTIGES SNACK-PRODUKT,GLANZBESCHICHTUNGSVERFAHREN, SOWIE GLANZBESCHICHTETES ÖLHALTIGES SNACK-PRODUKT | [2005/39] | English: | WATER-BASED SHELLAC COATING MATERIAL, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, COATED FOOD OBTAINED WITH THE COATING MATERIAL, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, COATED MEDICINE, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, GLAZING COMPOSITION FOR OILY SNACK, METHOD OF GLAZING, AND GLAZED OILY SNACK | [2005/39] | French: | MATIERE D'ENROBAGE DE GOMME LAQUE A BASE D'EAU, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANT, ALIMENT ENROBE OBTENU AVEC LADITE MATIERE D'ENROBAGE, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIE, MEDICAMENT ENROBE, SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION, COMPOSITION DE GLA AGE POUR COLLATION HUILEUSE, PROCEDE DE GLA AGE ET COLLATION HUIL | [2005/39] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2005 | Translation filed | 29.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 03.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/49] | 08.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5878539 ; | [X]KR20010089957 ; | [A]JPS60131459 ; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830728), vol. 007, no. 171, Database accession no. (C - 178), & JP58078539 A 19830512 (KOUTOU KK) [X] 1,2,4,5,19,22 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 23, Database accession no. 2002-178158, XP002360535 & KR20010089957 A 20011017 (LG CHEM INVESTMENT LTD) [X] 1,3 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 34, Database accession no. 1985-207147, XP002360536 & JPS60131459 A 19850713 (NIPPON SODA CO) [A] 1,3,8,12 * abstract * | International search | [A]JP2001321094 (TOKUNAGA KENJI); | [A]JPH04368321 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]JP2002201418 (NONOGAWA SHOJI YK) |