EP1582522 - INTERMEDIATE FOR 2-SUBSTITUTED CARBAPENEM DERIVATIVE AND PRODUCTION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meiji Seika Kaisha Ltd. 4-16, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8002 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Meiji Seika Kaisha, Ltd. 4-16, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Toshiro, Medicinal Chemistry Research Labs Meiji S. Kaisha, Ltd., 760, Morooka-cho, Kouhoku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 02 /
ANDO, Takashi, Medicinal Chemistry Research Labs. Meiji S. Kaisha, Ltd., 760, Morooka-cho, Kouhoku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMOTO, Yasuo, Medicinal Chemistry Research Labs Meiji S. Kaisha, Ltd., 760, Morooka-cho, Kouhoku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 04 /
IMAI, Takahiro, Medicinal Chemistry Research Labs. Meiji S. Kaisha, Ltd., 760, Morooka-cho, Kouhoku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 05 /
KUBOTA, Dai, Medicinal Chemistry Research Labs. Meiji S. Kaisha, Ltd., 760, Morooka-cho, Kouhoku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 06 /
NOGUCHI, Katsuhiko, Medicinal Chemistry Res. Labs. Meiji S. Kaisha, Ltd., 760, Morooka-cho, Kouhoku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8 / JP | 07 /
HORI, Nobuyuki, Medicinal Chemistry Research Labs. Meiji S. Kaisha, Ltd., 760, Morooka-cho, Kouhoku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 08 /
SHITARA, Eiki, Medicinal Chemistry Research Labs. Meiji S. Kaisha, Ltd., 760, Morooka-cho, Kouhoku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 09 /
ATSUMI, Kunio, Medicinal Chemistry Research Labs. Meiji S. Kaisha, Ltd., 760, Morooka-cho, Kouhoku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 10 /
YASUDA, Shohei, Chem., Man. & Control Research Lab Meiji Seika Kaisha, Ltd., 788, Kayama Odawara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0852 / JP | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03778922.9 | 15.12.2003 | [2005/40] | WO2003JP16036 | Priority number, date | JP20020361757 | 13.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002361757 | [2005/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004055027 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1582522 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D513/04, C07D519/06, C07F9/6561 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
C07D513/04 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07F9/6561 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZWISCHENPRODUKT FÜR 2-SUBSTITUIERTES CARBAPENEMDERIVAT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2005/40] | English: | INTERMEDIATE FOR 2-SUBSTITUTED CARBAPENEM DERIVATIVE AND PRODUCTION PROCESS | [2005/40] | French: | INTERMEDIAIRE POUR DERIVE DE CARBAPENEME SUBSTITUE EN POSITION 2 ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2005/40] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2005 | Translation filed | 04.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 04.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 20.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 21.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH08311071 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA); | [Y]WO0153305 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA [JP], et al); | [A]WO0155155 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA [JP], et al); | [Y]WO0242312 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA [JP], et al); | [AP]JP2003026686 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA) |