EP1556430 - BIOABSORBABLE ADHESIVE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | ||
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states TYCO HEALTHCARE GROUP LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | ||
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states TYCO HEALTHCARE GROUP LP 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | ||
For all designated states Roby, Mark S. 11 Grace Lane Kilingworth, CT 06419 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBY, Mark 11 Grace Lane Killingworth, CT 06419 / US | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/30] | HOFFMANN EITLE Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03779244.7 | 23.10.2003 | [2005/30] | WO2003US33826 | Priority number, date | US20020421881P | 28.10.2002 Original published format: US 421881 P | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004039857 | Date: | 13.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1556430 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1556430 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/12, C08G18/42, C09J175/06, A61L24/04 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
C08G18/10 (EP,US);
A61L24/046 (EP,US);
C08G18/8029 (EP,US);
C08K5/29 (EP,US);
C09J175/06 (EP,US);
C08G2230/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L24/046, C08L75/04 (EP,US);
C08G18/10, C08G18/76 (US,EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/8029 (US,EP);
C08K5/29, C08L67/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2005/30] | C08G18/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2006/07] |
Former [2005/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABSORBIERBARE ADHÄSIVE VERBINDUNGEN | [2005/30] | English: | BIOABSORBABLE ADHESIVE COMPOUNDS | [2005/30] | French: | COMPOSES ADHESIFS BIOABSORBABLES | [2005/30] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3773595 (BURBA C, et al) [A] 1-8,10,16 * column 1, line 29 - column 3, line 45; example 11; claims 1,5-7 *; | [A]US4323491 (VESELOVSKY ROMAN A, et al) [A] 1* column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 50; example 15; claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP0077192 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1,7,8 * page 1, line 33 - page 9, line 9; example 1; claims 1-8 *; | [A]US4804691 (ENGLISH JAMES P [US], et al) [A] 1,12-15,17 * column 2, line 60 - column 8, line 34; example 1; claims 1-21 * | International search | [Y]US4804691 (ENGLISH JAMES P [US], et al) |