EP1574218 - A MEDICAMENT CONTAINING EPIMEDIUM EXTRACT FOR TREATMENT OF PROSTATIC HYPERPLASIA AND PROSTATITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/37] | A MEDICAMENT CONTAINING EPIDEMIUM EXTRACT FOR TREATMENT OF PROSTATIC HYPERPLASIA AND PROSTATITIS | ||
[2010/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bright Future Pharmaceutical Laboratories Limited BF Pharmaceutical Cente, 8Wang Fu Street Yuen Long Industrial Estate Hong Kong / CN | [2010/11] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Bright Future Pharmaceutical Laboratories Limited BF Pharmaceutical Cente, 8Wang Fu Street Yuen Long Industrial Estate Yuen Long / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONG, Hui Room C 10/F No. 5 Tingtao Yayuan Ma An Shan Hong Kong / CN | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/37] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03779644.8 | 24.11.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003CN00994 | Priority number, date | CN2002148571 | 18.12.2002 Original published format: CN 02148571 | [2005/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004054596 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1574218 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1574218 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.07.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61P13/08, A61K36/296 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
A61K36/296 (EP,KR,US);
A61K36/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/258 (EP,US);
A61K36/481 (EP,US);
A61K36/756 (EP,US);
A61P13/08 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K36/00, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/258, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/296, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/481, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2010/06] | A61K36/00 | ||
Former IPC [2005/37] | A61K35/78, A61P13/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIKAMENT MIT EPIMEDIUM-EXTRAKT ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PROSTATAHYPERPLASIE UND PROSTATITIS | [2010/29] | English: | A MEDICAMENT CONTAINING EPIMEDIUM EXTRACT FOR TREATMENT OF PROSTATIC HYPERPLASIA AND PROSTATITIS | [2010/29] | French: | MEDICAMENT CONTENANT UN EXTRAIT D'EPIMEDIUM ET DESTINE AU TRAITEMENT DE L'HYPERPLASIE PROSTATIQUE ET DE LA PROSTATITE | [2005/37] |
Former [2005/37] | MEDIKAMENT MIT EPIDEMIUM-EXTRAKT ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON PROSTATAHYPERPLASIE UND PROSTATITIS | ||
Former [2005/37] | A MEDICAMENT CONTAINING EPIDEMIUM EXTRACT FOR TREATMENT OF PROSTATIC HYPERPLASIA AND PROSTATITIS | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2005 | Translation filed | 01.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 26.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.2010 | BE | 28.07.2010 | CY | 28.07.2010 | CZ | 28.07.2010 | DK | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | FI | 28.07.2010 | IT | 28.07.2010 | RO | 28.07.2010 | SE | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | SK | 28.07.2010 | TR | 28.07.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | ES | 08.11.2010 | IE | 24.11.2010 | PT | 29.11.2010 | HU | 29.01.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
HU | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
IE | 24.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
IT | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/12] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 28.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN1113802 ; | [Y]CN1219408 ; | [YP]WO03040134 (UNIV SINGAPORE [SG], et al) [YP] 1-12 *cf. abstract, page 6, line 13 bridging with page 8, line 25, page 15, line 19 to page 16, line 2, page 17, line 5 to page 18, line 19, page 27, last para. extending to page 28, line 14, page 33, 2nd ** full para.*; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 39, Database accession no. 1997-416195, XP002430372 & CN1113802 A 19951227 (SUINING CITY MEDICINE INST SICHUAN PROV) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 42, Database accession no. 1999-494765, XP002430373 & CN1219408 A 19990616 (SUN S) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * | International search | [A]CN1093600 (JIUJIUSAN SHENLI HEALTH CARE P [CN]); | [A]CN1113802 (SUINING CITY MEDICINE INST SIC [CN]); | [A]CN1194862 (JING YANYOU [CN]); | [XP]WO03040134 (UNIV SINGAPORE [SG], et al) |