EP1582007 - TRAINING SEQUENCE DETECTION SCHEME AND DEVICE FOR THE DOWNLINK OF A TDD/CDMA SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics, N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Dong, Philips Electronics China 21/F Kerry Office Building 218 Tian Mu Xi Road 200070 Shanghai / CN | 02 /
XU, Luzhou, Philips Electronics China 21/F Kerry Office Building 218 Tian Mu Xi Road 200070 Shanghai / CN | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Eleveld, Koop Jan Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Eleveld, Koop Jan Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03780488.7 | 29.12.2003 | [2005/40] | WO2003IB06251 | Priority number, date | CN2002160461 | 30.12.2002 Original published format: CN 02160461 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004059865 | Date: | 15.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1582007 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707, H04L25/02 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
H04B1/7093 (EP,US);
H04B1/7103 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70701 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAININGFOLGEDETEKTIONSSCHEMA UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE ABWÄRTSVERBINDUNG EINES TDD-KODEMULTIPLEXVIELFACHZUGRIFFSYSTEMS | [2005/40] | English: | TRAINING SEQUENCE DETECTION SCHEME AND DEVICE FOR THE DOWNLINK OF A TDD/CDMA SYSTEM | [2005/40] | French: | PROGRAMME ET DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION D'UNE SEQUENCE D'ENTRAINEMENT DANS UN SYSTEME TDD/CDMA DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE | [2005/40] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 28.03.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0876002 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [Y] 1-20 * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 4; figures 4,5 * * page 12, line 23 - page 15, line 9; figures 22,23; claims 1-23 *; | [X]EP1143630 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1,2,10-12,15-19* paragraphs [0026] - [0031] - [0047] - [0064]; figure 3 *; | [DY]WO0209375 (TELIT MOBILE TERMINALS SPA [IT], et al) [DY] 1-20 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 14 * * page 4, line 24 - line 29 * * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 7; claims 1-9 *; | [X]WO02093768 (INTEL CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,10-12,15-19 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 21 * * page 5, line 7 - page 6, line 19; figure 3A * * page 8, line 17 - page 10, line 14; figure 3B * * page 12, line 13 - page 14, line 14 * * page 18, line 18 - page 21, line 32 * |