EP1693581 - BEARING DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING PINION SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2010/34] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMURA, Motoshi, Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | 02 /
AKIYAMA, Muneyasu, Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | 03 /
TACHI, Hiroshi, Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Steinmeister, Helmut, et al Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Steinmeister, Helmut, et al Patentanwälte TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 03780726.0 | 11.12.2003 | [2006/34] | WO2003JP15854 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005057030 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1693581 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1693581 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/18, F16C33/78, F16C33/66, F16C33/32, F16C33/58, F16H57/02 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
F16H57/037 (EP,US);
F16C19/548 (EP,US);
F16C33/7869 (EP,US);
F16C35/06 (EP,US);
F16H57/021 (EP,US);
F16C19/163 (EP,US);
F16C19/182 (EP,US);
F16C19/184 (EP,US);
F16C2240/80 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/12] |
Former [2006/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAGERVORRICHTUNG ZUM STÜTZEN EINER RITZELWELLE | [2006/34] | English: | BEARING DEVICE FOR SUPPORTING PINION SHAFT | [2006/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PALIER POUR ARBRE DE PIGNON | [2010/34] |
Former [2006/34] | DISPOSITIF A PALIER POUR PIGNON ABRE | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2005 | Translation filed | 21.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2005 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 25.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 11.12.2010 | [2012/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5501530 (NAGAI KENICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * figure 2a ** column 4, lines 4-49 *; | [Y]JP2003232346 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [Y] 1-7 * figures 1-10 * | International search | [Y]DE2833362 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG); | [Y]JPH109258 (NIPPON SEIKO KK); | [Y]JPH109259 (NIPPON SEIKO KK); | [Y]JP2000046060 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003254326 (NSK LTD); | [Y]JP2000002239 (TOCHIGI FUJI SANGYO KK); | [Y]JP2003278765 (NACHI FUJIKOSHI CORP); | [Y]JP2003120696 (NACHI FUJIKOSHI CORP); | [A]JPH0586026U ; | [A]JP2003172341 (NSK LTD); | [A]JPH11153005 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) | by applicant | JPH09105450 | JPH10220468 |