EP1692765 - A FREQENCY MULTIPLIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: BE | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBSSON, Harald Fullriggaregatan 10A S-426 74 Västra Frölunda / SE | 02 /
LEWIN, Thomas Landstormsvägen 40 S-439 94 ONSALA / SE | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Schlossman, Ulf Albihns.Zacco Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Schlossman, Ulf Albihns Göteborg AB P.O. Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 03781194.0 | 10.12.2003 | [2006/34] | WO2003SE01919 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005057786 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1692765 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1692765 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03K5/00, // H03B19/00 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
G06F7/68 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/34] | H03K5/00, // H03B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FREQUENZVERVIELFACHER | [2006/34] | English: | A FREQENCY MULTIPLIER | [2006/34] | French: | MULTIPLICATEUR DE FREQUENCE | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 12.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 18.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 06.06.2007 | CY | 06.06.2007 | CZ | 06.06.2007 | DK | 06.06.2007 | EE | 06.06.2007 | FI | 06.06.2007 | IT | 06.06.2007 | LI | 06.06.2007 | RO | 06.06.2007 | SI | 06.06.2007 | SK | 06.06.2007 | TR | 06.06.2007 | BG | 06.09.2007 | SE | 06.09.2007 | GR | 07.09.2007 | ES | 17.09.2007 | PT | 06.11.2007 | HU | 07.12.2007 | IE | 10.12.2007 | LU | 10.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2017/04] |
Former [2016/41] | BE | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CY | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
TR | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
HU | 07.12.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
LU | 10.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/43] | BE | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CY | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
TR | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
HU | 07.12.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
LU | 10.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/40] | BE | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CY | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
LU | 10.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CY | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | BE | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
EE | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | BE | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | BE | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | BE | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
RO | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | BE | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
DK | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
IT | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
GR | 07.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | BE | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SK | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | BE | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
PT | 06.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | BE | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
BG | 06.09.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | BE | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | BE | 06.06.2007 | |
CH | 06.06.2007 | ||
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 06.06.2007 | |
FI | 06.06.2007 | ||
LI | 06.06.2007 | ||
SE | 06.09.2007 | ||
ES | 17.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 17.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5475322 (MACDONALD JAMES B [US]); | [X]US5786715 (HALEPETE SAMEER D [US]); | [A]US6147525 (MITANI HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US6150855 (MARBOT ROLAND [FR]); | [A]US6229358 (BOERSTLER DAVID WILLIAM [US], et al) |