EP1563275 - NANOMOTION SENSING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alegis Microsystems 851 W. Midway Avenue Alameda, CA 94501 / US | [2005/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEN, Michael John 1209 Broadway Alameda, CA 94501 / US | 02 /
GHISLAIN, Lucien 1060 Continentals Way 105 Belmont, CA 94002 / US | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Freeman, Avi, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Freeman, Avi, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place GB-London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2005/33] | Flint, Adam Beck Greener Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 03781361.5 | 21.10.2003 | [2005/33] | WO2003US33444 | Priority number, date | US20020420078P | 21.10.2002 Original published format: US 420078 P | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004038762 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1563275 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N11/00 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
G01N33/558 (EP);
C12Q1/02 (EP,US);
B82Y35/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NANOBEWEGUNGSMESSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2005/33] | English: | NANOMOTION SENSING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2005/33] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE DETECTION DE NANOMOUVEMENTS | [2005/33] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 09.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/42] | 29.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2008 | 31.10.2009 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2010 | 31.10.2011 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9938007 (UNIV CAMBRIDGE TECH [GB], et al); | [XI]US6016686 (THUNDAT THOMAS G [US]); | [XA]US6054277 (FURCHT LEO T [US], et al); | International search | [Y]US4202747 (BUZZA EDMUND E [US], et al); | [Y]US4300906 (NEGERSMITH KENT M); | [Y]US5620854 (HOLZRICHTER JOHN F [US], et al); | [Y]US6016686 (THUNDAT THOMAS G [US]); | [Y]US6054277 (FURCHT LEO T [US], et al); | [YP]US2002118005 (REICH ZIV [IL], et al); | [YP]US2003045019 (KUBENA RANDALL L [US]) |