EP1565182 - TREATMENT OF GASTROINTESTINAL DISORDERS WITH DULOXETINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2006 [2006/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis IN 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DETKE, Michael, J. 5018 St. Charles Place Carmel, IN 46033 / US | 02 /
GOLDSTEIN, David, Joel 1212 Kirkham Lane Indianapolis, IN 46260 / US | 03 /
IYENGAR, Smriti 1507 Redwood Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | [2005/34] | Representative(s) | Kingsbury, Oliver William Eli Lilly and Company Limited European Patent Operations Lilly Research Centre Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | Kingsbury, Oliver William Eli Lilly and Company Limited, Lilly Research Centre, Erl Wood Manor, Sunninghill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03781740.0 | 18.11.2003 | [2005/34] | WO2003US35051 | Priority number, date | US20020427514P | 19.11.2002 Original published format: US 427514 P | [2005/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004045606 | Date: | 03.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1565182 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/381, A61P1/04, A61P1/12, A61P1/14 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/381 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/34] | Extension states | AL | 20.06.2005 | LT | 20.06.2005 | LV | 20.06.2005 | MK | 20.06.2005 | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON GASTROINTESTINALEN ERKRANKUNGEN MIT DULOXETIN | [2005/34] | English: | TREATMENT OF GASTROINTESTINAL DISORDERS WITH DULOXETINE | [2005/34] | French: | TRAITEMENT DES TROUBLES GASTRO-INTESTINAUX PAR ADMINISTRATION DE DULOXETINE | [2005/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 02.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/38] | 20.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP0693282 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,4 * page 1, line 3 - line 8 * * the whole document *; | [X]WO0015223 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * * page 1, line 3 - line 6 * * page 5, line 34 - line 36 * * page 8, line 27 - line 31 *; | [X]WO0126623 (LAXDALE LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4 * claims 1,6,12 *; | [X]WO02062324 (KAMM MICHAEL ALBERT [GB]) [X] 1,3,4 * claims 1-3,27,28,41,42,51,52,54-56,58 *; | [PX]WO03090743 (CYPRESS BIOSCIENCE INC [US]) [PX] 1-4 * claims 1,2,6,11 * |