EP1597478 - RECIPROCATING PUMP WITH AN ECCENTRIC BEARING THAT IS DEVOID OF PLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGLE, Marcus Eisenachweg 3 71672 Marbach a. Neckar / DE | 02 /
FOERCH, Dirk Birkenstrasse 2 74196 Neuenstadt/Stein / DE | [2005/47] | Application number, filing date | 03782131.1 | 05.12.2003 | [2005/47] | WO2003DE04012 | Priority number, date | DE2003107128 | 20.02.2003 Original published format: DE 10307128 | [2005/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004074682 | Date: | 02.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1597478 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04B1/04 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
F04B1/0413 (EP);
F04B1/0417 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/47] | Title | German: | KOLBENPUMPE MIT SPIELFREIEM EXZENTERLAGER | [2005/47] | English: | RECIPROCATING PUMP WITH AN ECCENTRIC BEARING THAT IS DEVOID OF PLAY | [2005/47] | French: | POMPE A PISTON POURVUE D'UN ROULEMENT A EXCENTRIQUE SANS JEU | [2005/47] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 10.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/50] | 27.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB627065 (GEORGE JOSEPH TRAPP) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5785430 (BRIGHT JAMES ARTHUR ET AL) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5842405 (SCHAEFER ERNST-DIETER ET AL) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |