EP1569923 - USE OF A MIXTURE OF ESTERS OF FATTY ACIDS AS FUEL OR SOLVENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polimeri Europa S.p.A. Piazza Boldrini, 1 20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Polimeri Europa S.p.A. Piaza Boldrini 1 20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | ||
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Polimeri Europa S.p.A. Via E. Fermi, 4 72100 Brindisi / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOTARI, Marcello Via Castagnola, 33 I-43100 Parma / IT | 02 /
RIVETTI, Franco Via Oglio, 28 I-20139 Milan / IT | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03782220.2 | 20.11.2003 | [2005/36] | WO2003EP13027 | Priority number, date | IT2002MI02627 | 12.12.2002 Original published format: IT MI20022627 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004052874 | Date: | 24.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1569923 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1569923 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D317/36, C10L1/02 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
C10L1/02 (EP,KR,US);
C07D317/14 (KR);
C07D317/36 (EP,US);
C10L1/026 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER MISCHUNG AUS FETTSÄUREESTERN ALS BRENNSTOFF ODER LÖSUNGSMITTEL | [2005/36] | English: | USE OF A MIXTURE OF ESTERS OF FATTY ACIDS AS FUEL OR SOLVENT | [2005/36] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN MELANGE D'ESTERS D'ACIDES GRAS EN TANT QUE CARBURANT OU SOLVANT | [2005/36] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 29.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.05.2008 | CY | 07.05.2008 | DK | 07.05.2008 | EE | 07.05.2008 | FI | 07.05.2008 | SI | 07.05.2008 | SE | 07.08.2008 | GR | 08.08.2008 | IE | 20.11.2008 | LU | 20.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
CY | 07.05.2008 | ||
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.11.2008 | ||
LU | 20.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.11.2008 | ||
LU | 20.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
DK | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 07.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2967173 (FANG JAMES C) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US4695411 (STERN ROBERT [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * claim 1 *; | [DA]WO9309111 (HENKEL CORP [US]) [DA] 1-11 * page 1 - page 8; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1126011 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * claim 1 *; | [A] - MOULOUNGUI Z., PELET S., "Study of the acyl transfer reaction: Structurenand properties of glycerol carbonate esters", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF LIPID SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (2001), vol. 103, pages 216 - 222, XP001161204 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1438-9312(200104)103:4<216::AID-EJLT216>3.3.CO;2-A |