EP1569638 - AMINOALKOXYINDOLES AS 5-HT6-RECEPTOR LIGANDS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CNS-DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 127 4070 Basel / CH | [2005/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Shu-Hai 426 Ositos Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Braun, Axel F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP) 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | Braun, Axel F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department (PLP), 124 Grenzacherstrasse 4070 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 03782240.0 | 27.11.2003 | [2005/36] | WO2003EP13372 | Priority number, date | US20020430506P | 03.12.2002 Original published format: US 430506 P | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004050085 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1569638 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1569638 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/404, C07D209/30, C07D403/12, C07D401/12, C07D498/06, A61P25/28 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D209/30 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4025 (KR);
A61K31/404 (KR);
A61K9/02 (KR);
A61K9/20 (KR);
A61K9/48 (KR);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 04.07.2005 | LV | 04.07.2005 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMINOALKOXYINDOL-DERIVATE ALS 5-HT6-REZEPTORLIGANDEN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON ZNS-KRANKHEITEN | [2005/36] | English: | AMINOALKOXYINDOLES AS 5-HT6-RECEPTOR LIGANDS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CNS-DISORDERS | [2005/36] | French: | INDOLS AMINOALKOXY UTILISES EN TANT QUE LIGANDS DU RECEPTEUR 5-HT6 POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES DU SNC | [2005/36] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.09.2007 | CZ | 05.09.2007 | DK | 05.09.2007 | EE | 05.09.2007 | RO | 05.09.2007 | SI | 05.09.2007 | SK | 05.09.2007 | TR | 05.09.2007 | LU | 27.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | BG | 05.12.2007 | GR | 06.12.2007 | PT | 06.02.2008 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/40] | CY | 05.09.2007 | |
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
LU | 27.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
BG | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 05.09.2007 | |
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SI | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
RO | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | GR | 06.12.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9007505 (STERLING DRUG INC [US]) [A] 1-19* page 64, line 20 - page 65, line 19; example -; claim - *; | [Y]WO9808817 (AMERICAN HOME PROD [US]) [Y] 1-19 * page 7, lines 9-15; example -; claim - * * page 19, line 1 - page 21, line 20 *; | [A]WO0109142 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 18, line 30 - page 25, line 8; example -; claim - *; | [Y]WO02059088 (WYETH CORP [US]) [Y] 1-19 * examples 4,8,10,20; claim - *; | [Y]WO02085853 (WYETH CORP [US]) [Y] 1-19 * claims 1-11,22 * |