EP1581788 - BELT ASSEMBLY MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Royal Mail Group plc. Royal Mail House, 148 Old Street London EC1V 9HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Royal Mail Group plc. Royal Mail House, 148 Old Street London EC1V 9HQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parkin, Robert, Mechatronics Research Centre Holywell Building, Holywell Way Loughborough LE11 3UZ / GB | 02 /
Notini, Luca, Mechatronics Research Centre Holywell Building, Holywell Way Loughborough LE11 3UZ / GB | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Pendered, Timothy George, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Pendered, Timothy George, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03782673.2 | 19.12.2003 | [2005/40] | WO2003GB05614 | Priority number, date | GB20030000306 | 07.01.2003 Original published format: GB 0300306 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004061402 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1581788 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01L5/04 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
G01L5/042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BANDANORDNUNGSÜBERWACHUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2005/40] | English: | BELT ASSEMBLY MONITORING SYSTEM | [2005/40] | French: | SYSTEME DE CONTROLE D'ENSEMBLE A COURROIE | [2005/40] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 03.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/49] | 18.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5698796 (HIRANO SHIGEAKI) [X] 1,5,6 * column 1, line 28 - column 2, line 41 * [Y] 3; | [Y]DE4033778 (SKF GMBH) [Y] 3 * the whole document * |