EP1565218 - MOLECULES PREFERENTIALLY ASSOCIATED WITH EFFECTOR T CELLS AND METHODS OF THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tolerx, Inc. 300 Technology Square Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2009/12] |
Former [2005/34] | For all designated states Tolerrx Inc. 300 Technology Square, Fourth Floor Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAO, Patricia 112 Pope Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | [2005/34] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Nash, David Allan, et al HASELTINE LAKE Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2005/34] | Helbig, Christian European Patent & Trademark Attorney, Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03783270.6 | 10.11.2003 | [2005/34] | WO2003US35719 | Priority number, date | US20020424777P | 08.11.2002 Original published format: US 424777 P | US20030467477P | 02.05.2003 Original published format: US 467477 P | [2005/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004043386 | Date: | 27.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1565218 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, C12Q1/70, G01N33/53, C07K1/00, C12N5/00, C12N15/00 | [2005/34] | CPC: |
C12N9/1205 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K2319/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEVORZUGT MIT EFFEKTOR-T-ZELLEN ASSOZIIERTEMOLEKÜLE UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2005/34] | English: | MOLECULES PREFERENTIALLY ASSOCIATED WITH EFFECTOR T CELLS AND METHODS OF THEIR USE | [2005/34] | French: | MOLECULES ASSOCIEES DE PREFERENCE A DES LYMPHOCYTES T EFFECTEURS ET METHODES D'UTILISATION DE CES MOLECULES | [2005/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 01.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6040152 (KUPFER ABRAHAM [US], et al); | [X]WO0036083 (JOLLA INST ALLERGY IMMUNOLOG [US], et al); | [X]US6190869 (BENNETT C FRANK [US], et al); | [X]US2002068271 (ALTMAN AMNON [US], et al) |